26935 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2018DM00045 | 1/25/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DM00046 | 1/25/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DM00043 | 1/24/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DM00044 | 1/24/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DR00050 | PORTIA CHRISTINA VANLONG | 1/24/2018 | |||||||
Jehad Nasser M Qetairi vs Portia Christina Vanlong | |||||||||
2018DR00051 | KEVIN C TENNON | 1/24/2018 | |||||||
Theata Y Lambert Tennon vs Kevin C Tennon | |||||||||
2018DR00052 | STEVEN ROBINSON SR | 1/24/2018 | |||||||
Robyn Robinson vs Steven Robinson Sr | |||||||||
2018DR00053 | GLORIA DAWN DILLON | 1/24/2018 | |||||||
Jody Leigh Dillon vs Gloria Dawn Dillon | |||||||||
2018DM00042 | 1/23/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DR00047 | MERIJKE Z GODSEY | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
Joshua S Godsey vs Merijke Z Godsey | |||||||||
2018DR00048 | JONATHAN BROOKS J | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
Melissa J Brooks vs Jonathan Brooks J | |||||||||
2018DR00049 | AMY WOODS | 1/23/2018 | |||||||
Randolph Woods vs Amy Woods | |||||||||
2018DM00041 | 1/22/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DR00046 | RONALD MALISH | 1/22/2018 | |||||||
Janis Malish vs Ronald Malish | |||||||||
2018DM00040 | 1/19/2018 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2018DR00043 | KELLI R JEFFERY | 1/19/2018 | |||||||
Terry L Jeffery vs Kelli R Jeffery | |||||||||
2018DR00044 | JULIE M SAVOY | 1/19/2018 | |||||||
Kendall L Savoy vs Julie M Savoy | |||||||||
2018DR00045 | LAMONT HOARD | 1/19/2018 | |||||||
Candice Hoard vs Lamont Hoard | |||||||||
2018DR00041 | JOSHUA SCOTT GARRETT | 1/18/2018 | |||||||
Jill Marie Garrett vs Joshua Scott Garrett | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 602, 603, 604 ... 1345, 1346, 1347 Next |