26963 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00548 | 12/13/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR01073 | DONALD S MATALKA | 12/13/2017 | |||||||
Jenifer L Matalka vs Donald S Matalka | |||||||||
2017DM00547 | 12/12/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR01070 | MICHAEL A OLSEN | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
Sarah D Olsen vs Michael A Olsen | |||||||||
2017DR01071 | MOGHNIA H LEWIS | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
Dimitrious Lewis vs Moghnia H Lewis | |||||||||
2017DR01072 | MICHAEL S PITMAN JR | 12/12/2017 | |||||||
Chabre Pitman vs Michael S Pitman Jr | |||||||||
2017DM00544 | 12/11/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00545 | 12/11/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00546 | 12/11/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR01067 | ZULAYKHA RASHID | 12/11/2017 | |||||||
Kamal A Rashid vs Zulaykha Rashid | |||||||||
2017DR01068 | WILLIAM R OLIVER II | 12/11/2017 | |||||||
Nancy A Oliver vs William R Oliver Ii | |||||||||
2017DR01069 | JOSE ALCALA | 12/11/2017 | |||||||
Gloria Armenta vs Jose Alcala | |||||||||
2017DR01064 | KANSAS FOWLER | 12/8/2017 | |||||||
William Fowler vs Kansas Fowler | |||||||||
2017DR01065 | CHRISTIE M GILBERT | 12/8/2017 | |||||||
James T Gilbert vs Christie M Gilbert | |||||||||
2017DR01066 | KIMBERLY BROWN | 12/8/2017 | |||||||
David H Brown vs Kimberly Brown | |||||||||
2017DR01059 | PAULA L SASSER | 12/7/2017 | |||||||
Bobby R Sasser vs Paula L Sasser | |||||||||
2017DR01060 | WILLIAM L FOWLER | 12/7/2017 | |||||||
Kansas Fowler vs William L Fowler | |||||||||
2017DR01061 | REHUME V SCOTT | 12/7/2017 | |||||||
Mary L Frost Scott vs Rehume V Scott | |||||||||
2017DR01062 | SHEILA G BROWNLEE | 12/7/2017 | |||||||
Jeffrey N Brownlee vs Sheila G Brownlee | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 613, 614, 615 ... 1347, 1348, 1349 Next |