26980 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DR00825 | MARY ELIZABETH KAUFHOLD | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
Richard A Kaufhold vs Mary Elizabeth Kaufhold | |||||||||
2017DR00826 | JOANNA BORAM | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
Magen Boram vs Joanna Boram | |||||||||
2017DR00827 | VICKI LYNNE SMITH | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
Ronnie Smith vs Vicki Lynne Smith | |||||||||
2017DR00828 | KEVIN D MOORE | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
Sanja Moore vs Kevin D Moore | |||||||||
2017DR00829 | EMILY F KELLY | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
David C Kelly vs Emily F Kelly | |||||||||
2017DR00830 | CRAIG LEE JOE VIRES | 9/19/2017 | |||||||
Jessica Vires vs Craig Lee Joe Vires | |||||||||
2017DR00823 | CHAD FLINT | 9/18/2017 | |||||||
Katherine Flint vs Chad Flint | |||||||||
2017DR00824 | MARSHA A FARMER | 9/18/2017 | |||||||
Ronald L Farmer Sr vs Marsha A Farmer | |||||||||
2017DM00388 | 9/15/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00389 | 9/15/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00821 | VERONICA A HIEATT | 9/15/2017 | |||||||
Robert M Hieatt vs Veronica A Hieatt | |||||||||
2017DR00822 | ANGELA D ROBINSON | 9/15/2017 | |||||||
Raymond J Schreiber vs Angela D Robinson | |||||||||
2017DM00385 | 9/14/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00386 | 9/14/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00387 | 9/14/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00820 | AARON HAMMETT | 9/14/2017 | |||||||
Lindsey R Hammett vs Aaron Hammett | |||||||||
2017DR00816 | VALERIE BIZJAK ODELL | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
Zachary Odell vs Valerie Bizjak Odell | |||||||||
2017DR00817 | JEFFREY RONALD NIEKAMP | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
Nicole Marie Niekamp vs Jeffrey Ronald Niekamp | |||||||||
2017DR00818 | MELISSA A DAVIDSON | 9/13/2017 | |||||||
Jeremy R Davidson vs Melissa A Davidson | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 640, 641, 642 ... 1347, 1348, 1349 Next |