26956 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DR00772 | JAMES BACK JR | 8/31/2017 | |||||||
Sarah Back vs James Back Jr | |||||||||
2017DM00360 | 8/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00361 | 8/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00362 | 8/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00769 | PAULA R YENGER | 8/30/2017 | |||||||
Benny Holbert vs Paula R Yenger | |||||||||
2017DR00770 | MERYL G MORRIS | 8/30/2017 | |||||||
Matthew J Morris vs Meryl G Morris | |||||||||
2017DR00771 | ROBERT SPAHR | 8/30/2017 | |||||||
Shannon Spahr vs Robert Spahr | |||||||||
2017DM00358 | 8/29/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00359 | 8/29/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00765 | SARA M CUMMINS | 8/29/2017 | |||||||
William W Cummins vs Sara M Cummins | |||||||||
2017DR00766 | JAMES F GILMORE II | 8/29/2017 | |||||||
Laurie L Gilmore vs James F Gilmore Ii | |||||||||
2017DR00767 | KAREN S MCDANIEL | 8/29/2017 | |||||||
Letcher McDaniel vs Karen S McDaniel | |||||||||
2017DR00768 | JAMES A OSBORNE | 8/29/2017 | |||||||
Shannon M Stafford-osborne vs James A Osborne | |||||||||
2017DM00356 | 8/28/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00357 | 8/28/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00762 | JESSICA DIONE STOCKERT | 8/28/2017 | |||||||
Michael Boswell vs Jessica Dione Stockert | |||||||||
2017DR00763 | GARY R ROAN | 8/28/2017 | |||||||
Joyce A Mance Roan vs Gary R Roan | |||||||||
2017DR00764 | DANNIY CHAFFINS | 8/28/2017 | |||||||
Katrina Chaffins vs Danniy Chaffins | |||||||||
2017DR00760 | CONLEY ROACH | 8/25/2017 | |||||||
Nora Roach vs Conley Roach | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 643, 644, 645 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |