26844 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00274 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00275 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00276 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00273 | 6/29/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00565 | JEROME EDWARD FOSTER | 6/29/2017 | |||||||
Latonya Shantel Davis vs Jerome Edward Foster | |||||||||
2017DR00566 | ROBERT DUMMITT | 6/29/2017 | |||||||
Sapphira Palmer vs Robert Dummitt | |||||||||
2017DM00272 | 6/28/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00563 | STEVE J DORCH | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
Wendy S Dorch vs Steve J Dorch | |||||||||
2017DR00564 | JAMES E GENTRY III | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
Kyra L Gentry vs James E Gentry Iii | |||||||||
2017DM00271 | 6/27/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00559 | JOSEPH JAMES MURPHY | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Michele Beth Murphy vs Joseph James Murphy | |||||||||
2017DR00560 | MELINDA T DUFF | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Timothy C Duff vs Melinda T Duff | |||||||||
2017DR00561 | MATTHEW W WINAND | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Angela M Winand vs Matthew W Winand | |||||||||
2017DR00562 | SHAWN M HOWELL | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Heather L Howell vs Shawn M Howell | |||||||||
2017DM00269 | 6/26/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00270 | 6/26/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00557 | ANTOINE DENNIS SR | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
Gretchen L Dennis vs Antoine Dennis Sr | |||||||||
2017DR00558 | TYRAN GOOCH | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
Trammel Ladiamond vs Tyran Gooch | |||||||||
2017DR00555 | CHELSEY A LIVA | 6/23/2017 | |||||||
Eugene D Liva vs Chelsey A Liva | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 652, 653, 654 ... 1341, 1342, 1343 Next |