26956 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DR00635 | KAYLA M STACY | 7/20/2017 | |||||||
Derrick M Stacy vs Kayla M Stacy | |||||||||
2017DR00636 | JOHN J PARKER | 7/20/2017 | |||||||
Amber L Parker vs John J Parker | |||||||||
2017DR00637 | SHANNON L BLACKFORD | 7/20/2017 | |||||||
Samantha L Yarbrough Lewis vs Shannon L Blackford | |||||||||
2017DR00631 | MARIA L DEAN | 7/19/2017 | |||||||
Joe A Dean vs Maria L Dean | |||||||||
2017DR00632 | JORDAN A JEFFRIES | 7/19/2017 | |||||||
Sarah J Jeffries vs Jordan A Jeffries | |||||||||
2017DR00633 | JAMES M WRIGHT | 7/19/2017 | |||||||
Rebecca J Wright vs James M Wright | |||||||||
2017DR00634 | JONATHAN W CONSTANTINE | 7/19/2017 | |||||||
Melissa S Constantine vs Jonathan W Constantine | |||||||||
2017DM00296 | 7/18/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00297 | 7/18/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00626 | SHANNON SHELTON MILLER | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
Corey E Miller vs Shannon Shelton Miller | |||||||||
2017DR00627 | ANTHONY DAVID ANDERSON JR | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
Danielle Nashea Anderson vs Anthony David Anderson Jr | |||||||||
2017DR00628 | SARAH HARKOVICH | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
Nicholas Walker vs Sarah Harkovich | |||||||||
2017DR00629 | NETH KIM | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
Samath Uch vs Neth Kim | |||||||||
2017DR00630 | ANTUAN THORNTON | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
Amanda Blevins vs Antuan Thornton | |||||||||
2017DR00622 | TIMMY A POTTER | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
Leah R Potter vs Timmy A Potter | |||||||||
2017DR00623 | JAMES J LUCAS JR | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
Sherrita E Allen vs James J Lucas Jr | |||||||||
2017DR00624 | WILLIAM A SHACKELFORD | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
Atia C Shackelford vs William A Shackelford | |||||||||
2017DR00625 | JOHN ADAMS | 7/17/2017 | |||||||
Amber Adams vs John Adams | |||||||||
2017DR00620 | JOHN J JONES A716-315 JR | 7/14/2017 | |||||||
Dawn M Jones vs John J Jones A716-315 Jr | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 653, 654, 655 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |