26952 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00277 | 7/3/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00571 | MELVIN D DORSEY | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
Linda P Dorsey vs Melvin D Dorsey | |||||||||
2017DR00572 | SHAWN ARENETHIA HERRON | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
Ronald James Douglas Jr vs Shawn Arenethia Herron | |||||||||
2017DR00573 | JAMES JIM BROWN | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
Cynthia Brown vs James Jim Brown | |||||||||
2017DM00274 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00275 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00276 | 6/30/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00567 | XIAO LIANG | 6/30/2017 | |||||||
Xia Liang vs Xiao Liang | |||||||||
2017DR00568 | JASON STEINKE | 6/30/2017 | |||||||
April Steinke vs Jason Steinke | |||||||||
2017DR00569 | DAVID L CARR II | 6/30/2017 | |||||||
Holly A Carr vs David L Carr Ii | |||||||||
2017DR00570 | RONALD L RIZZO II | 6/30/2017 | |||||||
Constance E Rizzo vs Ronald L Rizzo Ii | |||||||||
2017DM00273 | 6/29/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00565 | JEROME EDWARD FOSTER | 6/29/2017 | |||||||
Latonya Shantel Davis vs Jerome Edward Foster | |||||||||
2017DR00566 | ROBERT DUMMITT | 6/29/2017 | |||||||
Sapphira Palmer vs Robert Dummitt | |||||||||
2017DM00272 | 6/28/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00563 | STEVE J DORCH | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
Wendy S Dorch vs Steve J Dorch | |||||||||
2017DR00564 | JAMES E GENTRY III | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
Kyra L Gentry vs James E Gentry Iii | |||||||||
2017DR00560 | MELINDA T DUFF | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Timothy C Duff vs Melinda T Duff | |||||||||
2017DR00561 | MATTHEW W WINAND | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
Angela M Winand vs Matthew W Winand | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 657, 658, 659 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |