26917 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00060 | 2/22/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00061 | 2/22/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00062 | 2/22/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00058 | 2/17/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00127 | JENNIFER J FLORENCE | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
Brent R Florence vs Jennifer J Florence | |||||||||
2017DR00128 | KYLE B MEYER | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
Rebecca E Meyer vs Kyle B Meyer | |||||||||
2017DR00129 | LYNETTE NEWTON | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
Oliver Newton vs Lynette Newton | |||||||||
2017DM00057 | 2/16/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00122 | MELISSA BROWN | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
Jeffery Brown vs Melissa Brown | |||||||||
2017DR00123 | JESSICA N BRYANT | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
Jeffrey Bryant vs Jessica N Bryant | |||||||||
2017DR00124 | AJA LARUE | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
Shaun Larue vs Aja Larue | |||||||||
2017DR00125 | JAMES S WILKINSON | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
Meredith A Wilkinson vs James S Wilkinson | |||||||||
2017DR00126 | STEVE L SMITH | 2/16/2017 | |||||||
Jerri L Smith vs Steve L Smith | |||||||||
2017DM00056 | 2/15/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00121 | DALE E EATON | 2/15/2017 | |||||||
Christinia V Eaton vs Dale E Eaton | |||||||||
2017DM00055 | 2/14/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00120 | PHILEMON K YOUNG | 2/14/2017 | |||||||
Yvette G Young vs Philemon K Young | |||||||||
2017DR00117 | CARLOS REYNOLDS JOHN | 2/13/2017 | |||||||
Latisha Elaine Smith vs Carlos Reynolds John | |||||||||
2017DR00118 | JERRY BRANDON WORMAN | 2/13/2017 | |||||||
Lauren Worman vs Jerry Brandon Worman | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 689, 690, 691 ... 1344, 1345, 1346 Next |