26956 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00017 | 1/17/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00018 | 1/17/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00014 | 1/13/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00015 | 1/13/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00016 | 1/13/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00027 | ADONIJAH S RASHE BENTON | 1/13/2017 | |||||||
Latasha M Benton vs Adonijah S Rashe Benton | |||||||||
2017DR00028 | JENNIFER ANN WALLER | 1/13/2017 | |||||||
Christopher Waller vs Jennifer Ann Waller | |||||||||
2017DR00029 | CHRISTINE M BAKER | 1/13/2017 | |||||||
Justin D Baker vs Christine M Baker | |||||||||
2017DR00030 | DIONNE E RAGLIN-GREEN | 1/13/2017 | |||||||
Jerry D Green Jr vs Dionne E Raglin-green | |||||||||
2017DR00031 | DAVID KARUNARATNE | 1/13/2017 | |||||||
Camille Karunaratne vs David Karunaratne | |||||||||
2017DM00011 | 1/12/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00012 | 1/12/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00013 | 1/12/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00026 | DEBORAH K DAVIS | 1/12/2017 | |||||||
William R Davis vs Deborah K Davis | |||||||||
2017DR00022 | EUGENE L SMITH | 1/11/2017 | |||||||
Peggy Joyce Smith vs Eugene L Smith | |||||||||
2017DR00023 | SALLY J YEDLOSKY | 1/11/2017 | |||||||
Joseph F Yedlosky vs Sally J Yedlosky | |||||||||
2017DR00024 | ADAM G CONNELLY | 1/11/2017 | |||||||
Krystal M Connelly vs Adam G Connelly | |||||||||
2017DR00025 | ANGELA M CRIDER | 1/11/2017 | |||||||
Robert A Crider vs Angela M Crider | |||||||||
2017DR00020 | ALAN P LILLY | 1/10/2017 | |||||||
Marilyn N Lilly vs Alan P Lilly | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 698, 699, 700 ... 1346, 1347, 1348 Next |