26939 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2016DM00606 | 12/23/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00607 | 12/23/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00608 | 12/23/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00603 | 12/22/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00604 | 12/22/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00605 | 12/22/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DR01119 | THOMAS S ADAMSON | 12/22/2016 | |||||||
Sandra A Adamson vs Thomas S Adamson | |||||||||
2016DR01120 | RALPH P STODD | 12/22/2016 | |||||||
Susan E Stodd vs Ralph P Stodd | |||||||||
2016DR01121 | SANDRA M HOWARD | 12/22/2016 | |||||||
Jerrod M Howard vs Sandra M Howard | |||||||||
2016DR01116 | FREDERICK TYLER PANSING | 12/21/2016 | |||||||
Emily Joyce Pansing vs Frederick Tyler Pansing | |||||||||
2016DR01117 | PAIGE N WILLIS | 12/21/2016 | |||||||
Paige N Brun vs Paige N Willis | |||||||||
2016DR01118 | PERRY T LUFT | 12/21/2016 | |||||||
Rebecca D Luft vs Perry T Luft | |||||||||
2016DM00602 | 12/20/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DR01112 | RODNEY THOMPSON | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
Rochonda S Hill Thompson vs Rodney Thompson | |||||||||
2016DR01113 | JESSICA M PRISER | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
Timothy S Priser vs Jessica M Priser | |||||||||
2016DR01114 | TYRONE POOLER SR | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
Jacita Pooler vs Tyrone Pooler Sr | |||||||||
2016DR01115 | AMY GREENE | 12/20/2016 | |||||||
Joshua D Lay vs Amy Greene | |||||||||
2016DR01109 | JARED M GLYNN | 12/19/2016 | |||||||
Amanda S Glynn vs Jared M Glynn | |||||||||
2016DR01110 | TRIXY RAE NATOR SU HILL | 12/19/2016 | |||||||
Antoine Jordan Hill vs Trixy Rae Nator Su Hill | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 700, 701, 702 ... 1345, 1346, 1347 Next |