26980 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2017DM00002 | 1/4/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00003 | 1/4/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DM00004 | 1/4/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00002 | ANGELO D TURPIN | 1/4/2017 | |||||||
Shanita L Clay Turpin vs Angelo D Turpin | |||||||||
2017DM00001 | 1/3/2017 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2017DR00001 | ALVIN THOMAS | 1/3/2017 | |||||||
Jessica Yvonne Thomas vs Alvin Thomas | |||||||||
2016DM00613 | 12/30/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00614 | 12/30/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DR01127 | SEAN P POLETE | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
Carrie E Polete vs Sean P Polete | |||||||||
2016DR01128 | MARK ANTHONY LAMB | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
Robin Elizabeth Lamb vs Mark Anthony Lamb | |||||||||
2016DR01129 | MARK MANNIX | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
Theresa Mannix vs Mark Mannix | |||||||||
2016DR01130 | KYLE PITTMAN | 12/30/2016 | |||||||
Shanda Roberts Pittman vs Kyle Pittman | |||||||||
2016DR01124 | DEBORAH J BELLAR | 12/29/2016 | |||||||
Casper C Bellar vs Deborah J Bellar | |||||||||
2016DR01125 | WILLIAM M FAIR | 12/29/2016 | |||||||
Mary Jane Fair vs William M Fair | |||||||||
2016DR01126 | KELSEY F MCNEAL | 12/29/2016 | |||||||
Justen L McNeal vs Kelsey F McNeal | |||||||||
2016DM00612 | 12/28/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DR01123 | RANDY JACKSON | 12/28/2016 | |||||||
Marianne Jackson vs Randy Jackson | |||||||||
2016DM00610 | 12/27/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
2016DM00611 | 12/27/2016 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 701, 702, 703 ... 1347, 1348, 1349 Next |