Daily Law Journal
17356 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number Defendant Date
2015DM00295 6/30/2015
vs
2015DR00640 BRETT RUSSELL WORTHAM 6/30/2015
Kathleen Marie Wortham vs Brett Russell Wortham
2015DR00641 RODNEY W HUTSON 6/30/2015
Robyn L Hutson vs Rodney W Hutson
2015DR00642 STACY A GARVIN SR 6/30/2015
Mary F Garvin vs Stacy A Garvin Sr
2015DR00643 JAMIE I ODOM 6/30/2015
Debra D Odom vs Jamie I Odom
2015DR00644 PHYLLIS L WITHERS 6/30/2015
Joseph H Withers Jr vs Phyllis L Withers
2015DR00645 MELISSA G JARVIS 6/30/2015
Robert P Jarvis vs Melissa G Jarvis
2015DR00636 MICHAEL T CLAUDE 6/29/2015
Maria D Claude vs Michael T Claude
2015DR00637 JUSTIN P SOLIS 6/29/2015
Mandi M Solis vs Justin P Solis
2015DR00638 HAVEN RODRIGUEZ 6/29/2015
Anselmo Rodriguez Alvarado vs Haven Rodriguez
2015DR00639 AIMEE SHAYE COMBS 6/29/2015
Timothy Allen Combs vs Aimee Shaye Combs
2015DR00633 SHAWNTAE MELSON 6/26/2015
Lemar C Melson vs Shawntae Melson
2015DR00634 JOHN MARK WARD 6/26/2015
Angela Rae Ward vs John Mark Ward
2015DR00635 ANTHONY FRANKLIN 6/26/2015
Monique Franklin vs Anthony Franklin
2015DR00631 DAVID HOWARD HOWSON 6/25/2015
Teresa Louise Howson vs David Howard Howson
2015DR00632 A 6/25/2015
A vs A
2015DM00294 6/24/2015
vs
2015DR00628 BRYAN R EAGLE 6/24/2015
Christine L Eagle vs Bryan R Eagle
2015DR00629 MICHAEL E HEEB 6/24/2015
Jolene E Heeb vs Michael E Heeb

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 427, 428, 429 ... 866, 867, 868  Next