Daily Law Journal
11450 Cases | Dayton Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF03069 MACK A COLVIN 10/30/2014
Cach, Llc vs Mack A Colvin
11CVF06708 KATINA M JONES 10/30/2014
Landmark Acceptance Corporation (heritage Acceptance Corporation) vs Katina M Jones
14CVI03969 LEAH C HAWKINS 10/29/2014
Eastside Chiropractic & Injury vs Leah C Hawkins
14CVI04307 JOSH WESTON 10/29/2014
Trevor Tilly vs Josh Weston
14CVI03781 AUDRA L STREHLE 10/29/2014
Dallas Padoven vs Audra L Strehle
14CVI04306 RHENE R. ALLEN 10/29/2014
Mulca Rambo Iii vs Rhene R. Allen
14CVI04364 HARLEY SHEPHERD 10/29/2014
Bethany Horn, et al vs Harley Shepherd
14CVI03224 UNITED ROOFING, ET AL 10/29/2014
Robert Cook vs United Roofing, et al
14CVI04296 ROSE ELHEGAZY 10/29/2014
Itasca C Bryant vs Rose Elhegazy
14CVI04343 MUFFLER BROTHERS 10/29/2014
Steven Brandy vs Muffler Brothers
97CVI00925 PAULA J HILLEARY 10/29/2014
Ida L Williams vs Paula J Hilleary
14CVI04278 MAHER ODEH, ET AL 10/29/2014
Alicia Lopez vs Maher Odeh, et al
14CVI04321 MARSHA STEPHENS 10/29/2014
Learning Express Plus, LLC vs Marsha Stephens
14CVF02438 TINA WADE 10/28/2014
Towne Properties Asset Management vs Tina Wade
14CVH03389 WILLA JOHNSON BELVINS 10/28/2014
Cynthia Dumas vs Willa Johnson Belvins
14CVF01723 DELISH CAFE, ET AL 10/27/2014
Shirley Hazim vs Delish Cafe, et al
14CVE01408 JANELL L. MONTAIE AKA JANELL L. REEVES 10/27/2014
California Casualty Indemnity Exchange vs Janell L. Montaie Aka Janell L. Reeves
14CVG04309 ELISHA S. BURRESS AND ALL OTHERS OCCUPANTS 10/24/2014
Greater Dayton Premier Management vs Elisha S. Burress And All Others Occupants
14CVG04311 TIFFANY R. NEWBERRY AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS 10/24/2014
Greater Dayton Premier Management vs Tiffany R. Newberry And All Other Occupants

1, 2, 3 ... 571, 572, 573  Next