15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI03348 | ALFONSO BARTOLON | 3/28/2023 | |||||||
THOMAS KRONAUGE and LESLIE STEIN vs ALFONSO BARTOLON | |||||||||
23CVI02050 | KYONG PRICE | 3/28/2023 | |||||||
STEVE JONES and ANGELA CANDLER vs KYONG PRICE | |||||||||
22CVG03922 | TAYVIAN M ROGERS AND TOYA M LANE | 3/27/2023 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs TAYVIAN M ROGERS and TOYA M LANE | |||||||||
22CVF03964 | JUSTIN MURAN | 3/27/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JUSTIN MURAN | |||||||||
22CVF03968 | SEAN RYON | 3/27/2023 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC vs SEAN RYON | |||||||||
22CVF03099 | JANICE S HEADINGS | 3/27/2023 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs JANICE S HEADINGS | |||||||||
22CVF03127 | RENA BRYANT | 3/24/2023 | |||||||
OCCIDENTAL DEVELOPMENT LLC vs RENA BRYANT | |||||||||
22CVF02489 | BRIAN S KINNISON | 3/24/2023 | |||||||
MYUSA CREDIT UNION INC vs BRIAN S KINNISON | |||||||||
22CVF02454 | SKYLOR FARIS | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SKYLOR FARIS | |||||||||
22CVF03785 | BRYAN M INMAN | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FIANACIAL GROUP, LLC vs BRYAN M INMAN | |||||||||
22CVF03561 | AMY M LOYD | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs AMY M LOYD | |||||||||
22CVG02955 | WILL WALLACE AND JATANA WALLACE | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
NICHOLAS NYE vs WILL WALLACE and JATANA WALLACE | |||||||||
22CVF03975 | THOMAS TOLER | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
HOCHWALT & SCHIFF, LLC vs THOMAS TOLER | |||||||||
22CVF04057 | GLOBAL MEDICAL PRODUCTS, LLC | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
B & G EQUIPMENT & TRUCK REPAIR vs GLOBAL MEDICAL PRODUCTS, LLC | |||||||||
23CVF02113 | BRANDON D GEER | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs BRANDON D GEER | |||||||||
22CVF03796 | KYLIE S JEFFERIES | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs KYLIE S JEFFERIES | |||||||||
22CVF03479 | JUANITA SMITH | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JUANITA SMITH | |||||||||
22CVF03939 | ALBERT C ROSS | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
N.A.R., INC vs ALBERT C ROSS | |||||||||
22CVF03976 | MIKA RENNEKER | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
HOCHWALT & SCHIFF, LLC vs MIKA RENNEKER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 136, 137, 138 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |