15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVG02269 | ALEXANDER SCOTT CAULLEY | 2/28/2023 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs ALEXANDER SCOTT CAULLEY | |||||||||
23CVG02267 | SAFIULLAH FAQIRY AND MARJAN FAQIRY | 2/28/2023 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs SAFIULLAH FAQIRY and MARJAN FAQIRY | |||||||||
22CVF03776 | NANCEY HURLEY | 2/27/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs NANCEY HURLEY | |||||||||
22CVF03800 | CONNER CREECH | 2/27/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs CONNER CREECH | |||||||||
22CVF03345 | JASON GLASCOCK | 2/27/2023 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs JASON GLASCOCK | |||||||||
22CVF03559 | JOHN WEBER | 2/27/2023 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs JOHN WEBER | |||||||||
22CVF03912 | JULIE WILSON | 2/24/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JULIE WILSON | |||||||||
21CVF03786 | JEFFREY L WILBURN II | 2/23/2023 | |||||||
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs JEFFREY L WILBURN II | |||||||||
22CVI03770 | ANDREW MILUTIN | 2/23/2023 | |||||||
ROLANDAS RAGAUSKAS vs ANDREW MILUTIN | |||||||||
22CVF03272 | JANICE S HEADINGS | 2/23/2023 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs JANICE S HEADINGS | |||||||||
22CVF03947 | CHRISTINA A REDWINE | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs CHRISTINA A REDWINE | |||||||||
22CVF03813 | JACQUELINE WILLIAMS | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs JACQUELINE WILLIAMS | |||||||||
22CVF03812 | WILLIAM GREESAMAN | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs WILLIAM GREESAMAN | |||||||||
22CVF03916 | KENYA RENEE TUCKER | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs KENYA RENEE TUCKER | |||||||||
22CVF03793 | JOHN M MCFARLAND | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs JOHN M MCFARLAND | |||||||||
22CVF03896 | AMANDA G STEPHENS | 2/22/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs AMANDA G STEPHENS | |||||||||
18CVF03573 | BRIAN DOLNEY | 2/21/2023 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC LENDINGCLUB CORP. / WEBBANK vs BRIAN DOLNEY | |||||||||
22CVF03591 | AKIDA ADISA | 2/21/2023 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs AKIDA ADISA | |||||||||
22CVF03040 | KATRINA HICKEY | 2/21/2023 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs KATRINA HICKEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 146, 147, 148 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |