15518 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF03464 | JILL PENWELL | 12/5/2022 | |||||||
DAYTON DENTAL SPECIALTIES vs JILL PENWELL | |||||||||
22CVF03290 | BRENDAN HOLTHAUS | 12/2/2022 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs BRENDAN HOLTHAUS | |||||||||
22CVF02265 | ASHLEY HILT | 12/2/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs ASHLEY HILT | |||||||||
22CVG02180 | MINDY BREEDING | 12/1/2022 | |||||||
MARLENE OLIVER vs MINDY BREEDING | |||||||||
22CVG03728 | JOSHUA CASERTA & ANTHONY BOGGS | 12/1/2022 | |||||||
MICHELLE MATLOCK vs JOSHUA CASERTA & ANTHONY BOGGS | |||||||||
22CVF03389 | JACOB R GLENN | 11/30/2022 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JACOB R GLENN | |||||||||
22CVF03590 | PRINCETON ENTERPRISES LLC | 11/30/2022 | |||||||
CAMERON FITE & MADISON PARKER vs PRINCETON ENTERPRISES LLC | |||||||||
22CVF03141 | JEFF WITTEN | 11/30/2022 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. c/o LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JEFF WITTEN | |||||||||
16CVF02698 | BARBARA CHAMPEN | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
AUTOVEST, L.L.C. vs BARBARA CHAMPEN | |||||||||
17CVF02760 | BRIAN M SORRELL | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BRIAN M SORRELL | |||||||||
20CVF02592 | RHONDA GRETZINGER | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs RHONDA GRETZINGER | |||||||||
20CVF02382 | MICHAEL COLEMAN | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs MICHAEL COLEMAN | |||||||||
19CVF02254 | JOSEPHINE F PEYTON | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC c/o LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JOSEPHINE F PEYTON | |||||||||
19CVF03834 | MELISSA L CASE | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MELISSA L CASE | |||||||||
19CVF02660 | DAVID E FITZPATRICK | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID E FITZPATRICK | |||||||||
20CVF02447 | JOSEPH HOWERTON | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND, LP vs JOSEPH HOWERTON | |||||||||
22CVF03438 | JAMES K ZUGELDER & ALL STAR ROOFING & SIDING LLC | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
ROSE C CRAWFORD vs JAMES K ZUGELDER & ALL STAR ROOFING & SIDING LLC | |||||||||
22CVF03166 | CRYSTAL WATSON | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CRYSTAL WATSON | |||||||||
22CVF03201 | CRYSTAL WATSON | 11/29/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CRYSTAL WATSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 162, 163, 164 ... 774, 775, 776 Next |