15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI03604 | COLLISION CENTER OF DAYTON | 11/15/2022 | |||||||
MARQUITA RODDY vs COLLISION CENTER OF DAYTON | |||||||||
22CVI03268 | CHRISTINE MANRIQUEZ | 11/15/2022 | |||||||
RV LIFE IS GOOD KIRK MORRIS vs CHRISTINE MANRIQUEZ | |||||||||
22CVI03347 | ADVOCACY OF MEDICAL CONSULTANT | 11/15/2022 | |||||||
CREST COMMERCIAL REALTY vs ADVOCACY OF MEDICAL CONSULTANT | |||||||||
22CVI03603 | KEN COPE | 11/15/2022 | |||||||
AMY EVANS vs KEN COPE | |||||||||
21CVF03661 | CLARICE MADDOX | 11/14/2022 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs CLARICE MADDOX | |||||||||
22CVF03208 | HANNAH E GREENE | 11/14/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs HANNAH E GREENE | |||||||||
22CVI03500 | STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS | 11/11/2022 | |||||||
GIGA GEDIANIDZE vs STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS | |||||||||
22CVF03248 | ALEXIS A MESSER | 11/11/2022 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs ALEXIS A MESSER | |||||||||
22CVI03515 | ERIC W JONES | 11/11/2022 | |||||||
ASHLEY D ADAMS vs ERIC W JONES | |||||||||
22CVF02468 | SCHULTZ'S HOBBIES | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
ROBERT MERKLE vs SCHULTZ'S HOBBIES | |||||||||
22CVE03185 | PHILIP B WORRELL AND LISA WORRELL | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
JANE ANN DUNING AND SONNENBERG MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. vs PHILIP B WORRELL AND LISA WORR... | |||||||||
22CVF03409 | ANASTAZIA N PHELPS | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs ANASTAZIA N PHELPS | |||||||||
22CVI03281 | RAAD Y ABDELNABI | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
DEASHA FINCH vs RAAD Y ABDELNABI | |||||||||
22CVG02177 | SHERRY WASHINGTON | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
ERIN CARTER AND BRIAN CARTER vs SHERRY WASHINGTON | |||||||||
22CVI02284 | R & M SERVANT AUTOMOTIVE LLC | 11/10/2022 | |||||||
HOWELL NEWMAN vs R & M SERVANT AUTOMOTIVE LLC | |||||||||
22CVF03391 | AMANDA STEPHENS | 11/9/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs AMANDA STEPHENS | |||||||||
22CVF02480 | KRISTEN ABEL | 11/9/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs KRISTEN ABEL | |||||||||
22CVF03449 | STEPHANIE A WEAVER | 11/9/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs STEPHANIE A WEAVER | |||||||||
22CVF02173 | GREGORY SIBERT | 11/9/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GREGORY SIBERT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 179, 180, 181 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |