15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVG03354 | CAMERON HARSHAW AND TRANICE LOVE | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP agent for MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE S vs CAMERON HARSHAW a... | |||||||||
22CVI03219 | FINAL FINISH BODY SHOP | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
WENDELL P RUTLEDGE vs FINAL FINISH BODY SHOP | |||||||||
22CVI02988 | TAYLOR JOSEPH STEELE | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
SYED ASAD BOKHARI vs TAYLOR JOSEPH STEELE | |||||||||
22CVI03182 | HANK A BROCK | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
LAWRENCE IMUNDO vs HANK A BROCK | |||||||||
22CVL00003 | STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
DANIELLE KOOGLER vs STEEPLECHASE APARTMENTS | |||||||||
18CVF02005 | WINFRED STAFFORD | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
AUTOVEST, L.L.C. vs WINFRED STAFFORD | |||||||||
16CVF03174 | MIKECIA N HARRIS | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs MIKECIA N HARRIS | |||||||||
19CVF03049 | STEWART PETERS | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs STEWART PETERS | |||||||||
21CVF03195 | ELIJAH SMITH | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs ELIJAH SMITH | |||||||||
22CVG03340 | HEATHER SHARP | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
JAMIE I LAKE vs HEATHER SHARP | |||||||||
22CVG03356 | MARLON VAN DYKE | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs MARLON VAN DYKE | |||||||||
22CVG03355 | JAMES PERRY II AND SOPHIA HERNANDEZ-PERRY | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs JAMES PERRY II and SOPHIA HERNANDEZ-PERRY | |||||||||
22CVG03353 | CRYSTAL BROWN | 9/6/2022 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO FOR KETWOOD APTS, LLC vs CRYSTAL BROWN | |||||||||
21CVF02947 | JENNIFER A EBNER | 9/5/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JENNIFER A EBNER | |||||||||
21CVF03003 | VALERIE DIETER | 9/2/2022 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs VALERIE DIETER | |||||||||
22CVF02509 | HELEN D MIRACLE | 9/1/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTERY VELDHUIS, vs HELEN D MIRACLE | |||||||||
03CVF03502 | ODESSA LAWSON | 9/1/2022 | |||||||
PLATINUM FINANCIAL VCS vs ODESSA LAWSON | |||||||||
22CVI03108 | MORAINE AUTO PARTS & SERV | 9/1/2022 | |||||||
DWIGHT V SAYLOR Jr. vs MORAINE AUTO PARTS & SERV | |||||||||
22CVF02649 | STEPHANIE L HUGHES | 8/31/2022 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs STEPHANIE L HUGHES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 200, 201, 202 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |