15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI03149 | AGORA REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT | 8/23/2022 | |||||||
DUSTIN DUNN vs AGORA REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT | |||||||||
22CVF03128 | ED MAKAPUGAY | 8/22/2022 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ED MAKAPUGAY | |||||||||
22CVF02880 | BRENDA FRAZIER | 8/22/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BRENDA FRAZIER | |||||||||
22CVF02885 | BUFFY CASSIDY | 8/22/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BUFFY CASSIDY | |||||||||
22CVI02638 | TYLER BOWLING | 8/19/2022 | |||||||
RINALDO DISALVO vs TYLER BOWLING | |||||||||
22CVF02867 | KATHERINE E WHITNEY | 8/19/2022 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK c/o LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs KATHERINE E WHITNEY | |||||||||
21CVF03799 | BRIAN LAMBERT | 8/19/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BRIAN LAMBERT | |||||||||
22CVF02706 | ERIC F WESTLEY | 8/19/2022 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS, LLC vs ERIC F WESTLEY | |||||||||
22CVF02293 | DONALD SEEBACH | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DONALD SEEBACH | |||||||||
21CVF03697 | TONY SULLIVAN | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
SANJU VARGHESE vs TONY SULLIVAN | |||||||||
22CVF02852 | MICHAEL HART | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA vs MICHAEL HART | |||||||||
22CVF02660 | FURY KUZMA | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs FURY KUZMA | |||||||||
22CVF02662 | KATELYNE A HOUSTON | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs KATELYNE A HOUSTON | |||||||||
21CVF03626 | ELLIOTT RONEY | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs ELLIOTT RONEY | |||||||||
21CVF03690 | ANTHONY BAILEY AND LINDSEY M BAILEY | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs ANTHONY BAILEY and LINDSEY M BAILEY | |||||||||
22CVF02892 | BEATRICE ZIRAJE | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BEATRICE ZIRAJE | |||||||||
22CVI02844 | KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS AND ABSOLUTE SMILE, LLC | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
FRANK E STEELE vs KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS and ABSOLUTE SMILE, LLC | |||||||||
22CVI02709 | SUSAN SMITH AND LISA PRICE | 8/18/2022 | |||||||
DANA COMBS vs SUSAN SMITH and LISA PRICE | |||||||||
21CVF03364 | CALVIN BAILEY | 8/17/2022 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs CALVIN BAILEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 208, 209, 210 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |