15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVG03028 | JENNIFER CARR | 7/19/2022 | |||||||
GOLD COAST REALTY COMPANY vs JENNIFER CARR | |||||||||
22CVI02844 | KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS AND ABSOLUTE SMILE, LLC | 7/19/2022 | |||||||
FRANK E STEELE vs KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS and ABSOLUTE SMILE, LLC | |||||||||
22CVI02609 | RONALD HECHT | 7/19/2022 | |||||||
VIP ASSET RECOVERY, LLC vs RONALD HECHT | |||||||||
22CVI02919 | STEPHEN J HARM | 7/19/2022 | |||||||
RONALD K QUILLEN vs STEPHEN J HARM | |||||||||
22CVG03027 | COURTNEY WEST | 7/19/2022 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs COURTNEY WEST | |||||||||
22CVG02888 | DARNELL RIPPLEY | 7/18/2022 | |||||||
OHIO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE & PROPERTY MNGMT, LLC vs DARNELL RIPPLEY | |||||||||
21CVF03886 | ABHINAYRED DONTHIREDDY | 7/18/2022 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs ABHINAYRED DONTHIREDDY | |||||||||
22CVF02353 | PAULA M PATE | 7/15/2022 | |||||||
N.A.R., INC vs PAULA M PATE | |||||||||
22CVF02448 | CORRINE WHITE | 7/15/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CORRINE WHITE | |||||||||
22CVI02550 | LARRY BLACK | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs LARRY BLACK | |||||||||
22CVF02473 | NICOLE GORDON | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NICOLE GORDON | |||||||||
22CVF02464 | ARLOW PHILLIPS | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ARLOW PHILLIPS | |||||||||
22CVF02589 | THOMAS ROHRER | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs THOMAS ROHRER | |||||||||
21CVF03452 | ROBERT ERBAUGH | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT ERBAUGH | |||||||||
21CVF02362 | JEFFERY J BAILEY | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
CVI SGP ACQUISITION TRUST vs JEFFERY J BAILEY | |||||||||
22CVI02405 | CHASITY REED | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
BONNIE WRIGHT and KALEB KENNISON vs CHASITY REED | |||||||||
22CVI02553 | HEATHER HAASE | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE REALTOR vs HEATHER HAASE | |||||||||
22CVI02315 | TIRE CHOICE | 7/14/2022 | |||||||
DARIUS JORDAN vs TIRE CHOICE | |||||||||
22CVF02424 | SEAN C RYON | 7/13/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs SEAN C RYON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 223, 224, 225 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |