15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03758 | MARY JOHNSON | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
EDGAR CRIOLLO vs MARY JOHNSON | |||||||||
21CVI03430 | SUITES AT WALNUT CREEK, LTD | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
JAMES D NEWTON vs SUITES AT WALNUT CREEK, LTD | |||||||||
21CVI03416 | JEFF PIERCE AND CAROLE PIERCE | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER GOSS vs JEFF PIERCE and CAROLE PIERCE | |||||||||
21CVI03624 | JOSHUA FROWEIN | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
JAMES LIPPINCOTT vs JOSHUA FROWEIN | |||||||||
21CVG03756 | JASMINE WITCHER | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs JASMINE WITCHER | |||||||||
20CVE02298 | GREATER DAYTON REGIONAL TRANSIT AUTHORITY AND OHIO... | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
CAROL A GAU vs GREATER DAYTON REGIONAL TRANSIT AUTHORITY and OHIO... | |||||||||
21CVF03478 | GARRICK EASON | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs GARRICK EASON | |||||||||
21CVF03437 | NICOLETTA ANUCI | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs NICOLETTA ANUCI | |||||||||
21CVF02426 | MARC GREENBURG | 12/18/2021 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs MARC GREENBURG | |||||||||
21CVF02796 | MOLLY SOWRY | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs MOLLY SOWRY | |||||||||
21CVI03168 | LUCAS GLANDON | 12/16/2021 | |||||||
CHRISTINE HORSTMAN vs LUCAS GLANDON | |||||||||
21CVF02495 | NEIL C COUTURE | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs NEIL C COUTURE | |||||||||
21CVF02133 | BRANDY SPENCER | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BRANDY SPENCER | |||||||||
21CVF02527 | ANDRE C JOHNSON | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs ANDRE C JOHNSON | |||||||||
21CVF03357 | GREGORY KERR | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs GREGORY KERR | |||||||||
21CVF03399 | JONATHON WHITE | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs JONATHON WHITE | |||||||||
21CVF03121 | TYRONE M PETTY | 12/15/2021 | |||||||
SONNENBERG MUTUAL INSURANCE COMP a/s/o Clyde S. Woodley vs TYRONE M PETTY | |||||||||
21CVF03334 | RICHARD E LEE AND TIMOTHY TYE | 12/14/2021 | |||||||
DONALD G BOLTON and DAWN STINSON vs RICHARD E LEE and TIMOTHY TYE | |||||||||
21CVF03335 | SCOTT DIORIO AND RICHARD E LEE | 12/14/2021 | |||||||
DONALD G BOLTON and DAWN M STINSON vs SCOTT DIORIO and RICHARD E LEE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 291, 292, 293 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |