15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03829 | CAMERON D LORENZO & HEATHER LORENZO | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY, ,LLC FOR 2107 BATAAN DR EAST, LLC vs CAMERON D LORENZO & HEATHER LOREN... | |||||||||
21CVG03834 | JOY M BARNHILL & EDUARDO C CANO | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY, LLC vs JOY M BARNHILL & EDUARDO C CANO | |||||||||
21CVG03835 | CHADERICK GRANT | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP, AGENT FOR RESIDENZ II, LLC vs CHADERICK GRANT | |||||||||
21CVG03836 | BRENDAN WERGOWSKE | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BRENDAN WERGOWSKE | |||||||||
21CVG03740 | EIRINN GASTINEAU | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
TSG PROPERTIES c/o THOMAS GASTINEAU vs EIRINN GASTINEAU | |||||||||
21CVG03750 | KRISTIN ROARK | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP, LLC AGT FOR GK OH vs KRISTIN ROARK | |||||||||
21CVG03842 | SANDRA SCHMITZ | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs SANDRA SCHMITZ | |||||||||
21CVF02919 | CAREY E BRENTLINGER | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CAREY E BRENTLINGER | |||||||||
21CVG03828 | LEANDRA HUDSON | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO vs LEANDRA HUDSON | |||||||||
21CVF03047 | JANET BAKER | 1/3/2022 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs JANET BAKER | |||||||||
21CVF03315 | GISELE BINGAYA | 12/30/2021 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs GISELE BINGAYA | |||||||||
21CVI03649 | JACK STEVENS | 12/30/2021 | |||||||
DEMOS VOUDRIS vs JACK STEVENS | |||||||||
21CVI03147 | VALVOLINE,LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM & VALVOLIN... | 12/30/2021 | |||||||
DANIEL GLASER & JULIET GLASER vs VALVOLINE,LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM & VALVOLIN..... | |||||||||
21CVF03480 | SHERYL L BOSTWICK | 12/29/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs SHERYL L BOSTWICK | |||||||||
20CVF03694 | VERNADINE JACKSON | 12/29/2021 | |||||||
SHERRETS LAW OFFICES, LLC vs VERNADINE JACKSON | |||||||||
21CVF03175 | PAIGE CROWDER | 12/29/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs PAIGE CROWDER | |||||||||
21CVF03311 | MAKENZIE MCMILLEN AND GABRIELL ANN METZNER | 12/29/2021 | |||||||
WASHINGTON PLACE, LTD vs MAKENZIE MCMILLEN and GABRIELL ANN METZNER | |||||||||
21CVF03335 | SCOTT DIORIO AND RICHARD E LEE | 12/29/2021 | |||||||
DONALD G BOLTON and DAWN M STINSON vs SCOTT DIORIO and RICHARD E LEE | |||||||||
21CVF03570 | LESLIE BORT | 12/28/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs LESLIE BORT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 292, 293, 294 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |