10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVF03596 | KRISTINA KLAWONN | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE , N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY, & VELDHUIS, vs KRISTINA KLAWONN | |||||||||
24CVF02079 | ASHLEIGH HUBBS | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ASHLEIGH HUBBS | |||||||||
23CVF03477 | KATHERINE E LARAVIE | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs KATHERINE E LARAVIE | |||||||||
23CVF04094 | TAYLOR BRACKNEY | 3/22/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs TAYLOR BRACKNEY | |||||||||
23CVF03531 | STEPHEN RAY SMITH | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs STEPHEN RAY SMITH | |||||||||
24CVF02102 | BARBARA KOOSER | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs BARBARA KOOSER | |||||||||
23CVF03860 | JESSE LEFFORGE | 3/21/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JESSE LEFFORGE | |||||||||
23CVI04078 | A.D.KISTLER & SON | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
SAMUEL ISON vs A.D.KISTLER & SON | |||||||||
24CVF02453 | LYNNEE D ROBERTS | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. vs LYNNEE D ROBERTS | |||||||||
23CVF03483 | PAIGE BELL | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs PAIGE BELL | |||||||||
23CVF03446 | DOUGLAS SHINDELDECKER | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS PC vs DOUGLAS SHINDELDECKER | |||||||||
23CVF03901 | NACOLE L HINES | 3/20/2024 | |||||||
TRIHEALTH INC C/O RACHEL J MASON vs NACOLE L HINES | |||||||||
23CVF03792 | BRYON M. WELLS | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs BRYON M. WELLS | |||||||||
24CVI02011 | DANNY ALLEY JR. | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
PEGGY HUNTER vs DANNY ALLEY Jr. | |||||||||
23CVI03751 | STEPHANIE HARPER | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs STEPHANIE HARPER | |||||||||
23CVF03846 | ELIZABETH R LITTLE | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs ELIZABETH R LITTLE | |||||||||
23CVF02091 | JEFFREY M DEY | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs JEFFREY M DEY | |||||||||
23CVI03014 | ASHAKI N DAUGHTERY | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
RONIKA I MARTIN vs ASHAKI N DAUGHTERY | |||||||||
23CVF04014 | AMANDA LEHMAN | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs AMANDA LEHMAN | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |