Daily Law Journal
5219 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVV00055 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 3/11/2014
CHRISTOPHER HEMMERLY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
14CVV00050 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/10/2014
KEVIN FEW vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
14CVV00051 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/10/2014
SASHA LEE SNYDER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
14CVV00052 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 3/10/2014
JOSHUA R LAKES vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
14CVI02203 RHONDA SHEETER 3/10/2014
WILLIAM ARROWOOD vs RHONDA SHEETER
14CVV00049 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... 3/10/2014
JUSTIN A REGGINELLO vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR...
14CVI02198 DONALD SAUNDER 3/7/2014
MARK RENWICK vs DONALD SAUNDER
14CVI02199 LARRY BAUMAUSTER 3/7/2014
JACK DAUGHERTY vs LARRY BAUMAUSTER
14CVV00048 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/7/2014
JEFFREY J SECREST vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
14CVF02200 SHELLY WATSON 3/7/2014
MIKE GALLMARE CONSTRUCTION CO. INC vs SHELLY WATSON
14CVF02202 EVAN HOUSER 3/7/2014
CACH, LLC vs EVAN HOUSER
14CVG02201 BRANDEN BLAND 3/7/2014
SUNSET PROPERTIES II, LLC vs BRANDEN BLAND
14CVF02197 HEATHER N LINNEVERS 3/6/2014
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK vs HEATHER N LINNEVERS
14CVV00047 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/5/2014
MICHAEL R SHELTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
14CVI02195 DONALD SAUNDERS 3/5/2014
TOM PRESDORE vs DONALD SAUNDERS
14CVI02196 DONALD SAUNDERS 3/5/2014
GARY SMITH vs DONALD SAUNDERS
14CVV00046 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR 3/5/2014
TROY BEINING vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR
14CVE02194 SATURN OF DAYTON INC 3/4/2014
JOEL HEATON vs SATURN OF DAYTON INC
14CVV00045 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 3/4/2014
CHRISTOPHER D HASTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 94, 95, 96 ... 259, 260, 261  Next