20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVV00019 | BMV | 6/21/2023 | |||||||
SHYNIS ROBINSON vs BMV | |||||||||
23CVG02918 | JOANN JOZWIAK | 6/20/2023 | |||||||
VLADIMAR MAROZ vs JOANN JOZWIAK | |||||||||
23CVF02851 | SHAIDA WHITE | 6/9/2023 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs SHAIDA WHITE | |||||||||
23CVF02852 | JEFFERY GETER | 6/9/2023 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT vs JEFFERY GETER | |||||||||
23CVF02853 | MONIQUE DAVIS | 6/9/2023 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT L vs MONIQUE DAVIS | |||||||||
23CVF02854 | ELIZABETH WILLIAMS | 6/9/2023 | |||||||
ADLP INVESTMENTS LLC, SERIES 1 vs ELIZABETH WILLIAMS | |||||||||
23CVF02850 | STACY WORTHAM | 6/8/2023 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE LLC vs STACY WORTHAM | |||||||||
23CVG02849 | BRANDON ARBAUGH | 6/8/2023 | |||||||
NORMA BACK vs BRANDON ARBAUGH | |||||||||
23CVG02847 | JESSICA FISHER | 6/7/2023 | |||||||
SIMMS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs JESSICA FISHER | |||||||||
23CVG02846 | TRAVISHAY KENNEDY | 6/7/2023 | |||||||
HUBER MANAGEMENT CORP. vs TRAVISHAY KENNEDY | |||||||||
23CVG02845 | MAHER O ALSHOURA | 6/7/2023 | |||||||
LAWRENCE T JAFFE vs MAHER O ALSHOURA | |||||||||
23CVF02834 | JEREMY M BRADEN | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs JEREMY M BRADEN | |||||||||
23CVF02838 | JERRY BAKER JR. | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs JERRY BAKER Jr. | |||||||||
23CVF02842 | EMILY DEWITT | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs EMILY DEWITT | |||||||||
23CVF02843 | MATTHEW AYERS | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MATTHEW AYERS | |||||||||
23CVF02844 | RYAN NELSON | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC vs RYAN NELSON | |||||||||
23CVG02836 | JACQUELYNN GRAGG | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
LALIQUE APARTMENTS, LLC vs JACQUELYNN GRAGG | |||||||||
23CVI02837 | CHOICE HOME WARRANTY | 6/6/2023 | |||||||
GARY FORREST vs CHOICE HOME WARRANTY | |||||||||
23CVF02830 | BRANYEL THOMAS | 6/5/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs BRANYEL THOMAS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 95, 96, 97 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |