20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVF02876 | NAASEH S HENDERSON | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs NAASEH S HENDERSON | |||||||||
22CVF02877 | ANDREW J BOWLING | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ANDREW J BOWLING | |||||||||
22CVF02878 | WILLIAM FULLER | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs WILLIAM FULLER | |||||||||
22CVF02879 | BRIAN S KINNISON | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs BRIAN S KINNISON | |||||||||
22CVF02880 | BRENDA FRAZIER | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BRENDA FRAZIER | |||||||||
22CVF02875 | BRANDON CORNETT | 6/6/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BRANDON CORNETT | |||||||||
22CVV00017 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 6/3/2022 | |||||||
LIBNI UZHCA vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
22CVG02846 | JUSTIN DUNN | 6/2/2022 | |||||||
COLIN HEAGLE vs JUSTIN DUNN | |||||||||
22CVG02847 | GIOVANNI DIAZ | 6/2/2022 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs GIOVANNI DIAZ | |||||||||
22CVG02848 | WILLIAM GROSSLEY | 6/2/2022 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs WILLIAM GROSSLEY | |||||||||
22CVG02845 | DEBBIE J PHILLIPPI | 6/1/2022 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP, LLC vs DEBBIE J PHILLIPPI | |||||||||
22CVI02844 | KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS | 6/1/2022 | |||||||
FRANK E STEELE vs KATHERINE O'HARA, DDS | |||||||||
22CVI02839 | TWO MEN AND A TRUCK | 5/31/2022 | |||||||
RHONDA WATTS vs TWO MEN AND A TRUCK | |||||||||
22CVF02834 | EIRINN P GASTINEAU | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
THOMAS D GASTINEAU vs EIRINN P GASTINEAU | |||||||||
22CVI02836 | PLUM TREE REALTY WILLIS & RIFE GROUP | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
MICHELLE HERRON vs PLUM TREE REALTY WILLIS & RIFE GROUP | |||||||||
22CVG02837 | RONALD GREGORY | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
HOLLY BIDWELL vs RONALD GREGORY | |||||||||
22CVG02833 | ESTATE OF JEFFREY BROWNLEE C/O ASHLEY MACEK, APPLI... | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
SIMMS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs ESTATE OF JEFFREY BROWNLEE C/O ASHLEY MACEK, APPLI... | |||||||||
22CVG02832 | CAMERON HARSHAW | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENTS & MGMT GROUP, LLC vs CAMERON HARSHAW | |||||||||
22CVG02831 | MICHELLE YOUNT | 5/27/2022 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs MICHELLE YOUNT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 196, 197, 198 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |