20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
22CVI02378 | ANITA HUART | 3/18/2022 | |||||||
RALPH HAYNES vs ANITA HUART | |||||||||
22CVE02376 | TIMOTHY SHEPHERD | 3/17/2022 | |||||||
SIZEMORE REMODELING, LLC vs TIMOTHY SHEPHERD | |||||||||
22CVF02377 | CARIN E AL HAMDANI | 3/17/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs CARIN E AL HAMDANI | |||||||||
22CVG02349 | DEBRA COX | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs DEBRA COX | |||||||||
22CVG02368 | KIM BLAZINSKI | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
KEO MANAGEMENT, LLC vs KIM BLAZINSKI | |||||||||
22CVG02362 | ALEXANDER SAGE | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO vs ALEXANDER SAGE | |||||||||
22CVG02360 | CECILLE TEJADA | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO vs CECILLE TEJADA | |||||||||
22CVG02358 | RONAN KISCH | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
WERTZ REALTY INC FOR: CHARLES R. SR. & SUSANNE W vs RONAN KISCH | |||||||||
22CVG02351 | AMY PATEL | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE LLC vs AMY PATEL | |||||||||
22CVG02350 | TYLER MILLION | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs TYLER MILLION | |||||||||
22CVG02347 | SHAWNETTA LYNN WHITE | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
MILLER FARM APARTMENTS LLC vs SHAWNETTA LYNN WHITE | |||||||||
22CVF02375 | YVONNE KIRBY | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs YVONNE KIRBY | |||||||||
22CVF02374 | JOCELYN ABRON | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs JOCELYN ABRON | |||||||||
22CVF02373 | SAVANNAH SMITH | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs SAVANNAH SMITH | |||||||||
22CVF02372 | NICHOLAS ANGLE | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs NICHOLAS ANGLE | |||||||||
22CVF02371 | A;YSSA ARTZ | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs A;YSSA ARTZ | |||||||||
22CVF02353 | PAULA M PATE | 3/16/2022 | |||||||
N.A.R., INC vs PAULA M PATE | |||||||||
22CVV00007 | BMV | 3/15/2022 | |||||||
BRIAN COLLINS vs BMV | |||||||||
22CVE02352 | ALL STAR FENCE, LLC | 3/14/2022 | |||||||
THE OHIO BELL TELEPHONE CO vs ALL STAR FENCE, LLC | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 214, 215, 216 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |