20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03735 | KARY STATON | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE SUB, LLC vs KARY STATON | |||||||||
21CVG03736 | DARRELL JONES | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL vs DARRELL JONES | |||||||||
21CVG03742 | KIAIR BROOKS | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
BIRGE & HELD ASSET MGMT FOR NEW vs KIAIR BROOKS | |||||||||
21CVI03743 | KATIE MCCORMICK | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs KATIE MCCORMICK | |||||||||
21CVI03744 | KORRIN ZISWILER | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs KORRIN ZISWILER | |||||||||
21CVI03745 | LINDSAY MELVIN | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs LINDSAY MELVIN | |||||||||
21CVI03746 | STACEY KOUSE | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs STACEY KOUSE | |||||||||
21CVI03747 | JAZZMEN MORGAN | 11/29/2021 | |||||||
ALEXANDRIA MONTESSORI SCHOOL, IN vs JAZZMEN MORGAN | |||||||||
21CVF03674 | MERRILL COMPLETE CONSTRUCTION LL | 11/19/2021 | |||||||
MICHAEL JENSEN vs MERRILL COMPLETE CONSTRUCTION LL | |||||||||
21CVG03675 | HALEY HAWN | 11/19/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN LION REALTY GROUP, LLC vs HALEY HAWN | |||||||||
21CVG03657 | KALA M BARNES | 11/16/2021 | |||||||
DIANE L MOSHER vs KALA M BARNES | |||||||||
21CVG03658 | NICOLE WAINSCOTT | 11/16/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES PARAGON ASSOCIATES vs NICOLE WAINSCOTT | |||||||||
21CVG03659 | RENEE REESE | 11/16/2021 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE LLC vs RENEE REESE | |||||||||
21CVF03666 | CHRISTOPHER YOUNG | 11/15/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHRISTOPHER YOUNG | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 241, 242, 243 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |