20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03842 | SANDRA SCHMITZ | 12/22/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs SANDRA SCHMITZ | |||||||||
21CVF03841 | TIFFANY C CORNELY | 12/22/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs TIFFANY C CORNELY | |||||||||
21CVF03830 | BESTER PETERSON | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
PELLA SALES INC vs BESTER PETERSON | |||||||||
21CVF03831 | LORISSA YOUNG | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCIAL LLC vs LORISSA YOUNG | |||||||||
21CVF03838 | BRIAN SMITH | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BRIAN SMITH | |||||||||
21CVF03839 | TIMOTHY MOORE | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs TIMOTHY MOORE | |||||||||
21CVG03834 | JOY M BARNHILL | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY, LLC vs JOY M BARNHILL | |||||||||
21CVG03835 | CHADERICK GRANT | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP, AGENT FOR RESIDENZ II, LLC vs CHADERICK GRANT | |||||||||
21CVG03836 | BRENDAN WERGOWSKE | 12/21/2021 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BRENDAN WERGOWSKE | |||||||||
21CVF03837 | RONALD MYER | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs RONALD MYER | |||||||||
21CVI03843 | DAVID COX | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
JAMES THOMPSON vs DAVID COX | |||||||||
21CVI03827 | ETIENNE G MANDELA | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
STEVE HARROP vs ETIENNE G MANDELA | |||||||||
21CVF03832 | JEFFRY WILBURN | 12/20/2021 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs JEFFRY WILBURN | |||||||||
21CVF03825 | GUY ABRAMS | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs GUY ABRAMS | |||||||||
21CVF03826 | ANTHONY J WILLIAMSON | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs ANTHONY J WILLIAMSON | |||||||||
21CVF03833 | CATHERINE MCCOY | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs CATHERINE MCCOY | |||||||||
21CVG03828 | LEANDRA HUDSON | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO vs LEANDRA HUDSON | |||||||||
21CVG03829 | CAMERON D LORENZO | 12/17/2021 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY, ,LLC FOR 2107 BATAAN DR EAST, LLC vs CAMERON D LORENZO | |||||||||
21CVF03819 | EDDIE WHEATON JR. | 12/16/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs EDDIE WHEATON Jr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 242, 243, 244 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |