20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI03649 | JACK STEVENS | 11/12/2021 | |||||||
DEMOS VOUDRIS vs JACK STEVENS | |||||||||
21CVF03643 | MICHAEL CHANEY | 11/10/2021 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs MICHAEL CHANEY | |||||||||
21CVF03647 | CLAVELITA PEKARSKI | 11/10/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs CLAVELITA PEKARSKI | |||||||||
21CVG03635 | JAMES E LEAK | 11/10/2021 | |||||||
THOMAS E HOSKINS vs JAMES E LEAK | |||||||||
21CVG03641 | MARQUIS HARDMAN | 11/10/2021 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs MARQUIS HARDMAN | |||||||||
21CVG03642 | RANISHA JONES | 11/10/2021 | |||||||
LALIQUE APARTMENTS LLC vs RANISHA JONES | |||||||||
21CVF03644 | JEFFRY WILBURN | 11/9/2021 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA vs JEFFRY WILBURN | |||||||||
21CVF03645 | JAMES G NEARY | 11/9/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs JAMES G NEARY | |||||||||
21CVF03646 | JAMIE PICKREL | 11/9/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAMIE PICKREL | |||||||||
21CVG03633 | KADIJIH STROLGER | 11/9/2021 | |||||||
BRANDON RODGERS vs KADIJIH STROLGER | |||||||||
21CVF03634 | ZACHARY KAISER | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ZACHARY KAISER | |||||||||
21CVV00030 | BMV | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
TRENTON RYAN WARREN vs BMV | |||||||||
21CVF03640 | KATHERINE JOHNSON | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs KATHERINE JOHNSON | |||||||||
21CVF03639 | JAMES PINNEY | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC vs JAMES PINNEY | |||||||||
21CVF03638 | DEANNA M PEAVY | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs DEANNA M PEAVY | |||||||||
21CVF03637 | AHLAM HAMED | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs AHLAM HAMED | |||||||||
21CVF03636 | TESSA DALCOURT | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs TESSA DALCOURT | |||||||||
21CVF03621 | BERNARD L TAYLOR | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BERNARD L TAYLOR | |||||||||
21CVG03625 | DEANNA ALLEN | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
KEYNOTE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEME vs DEANNA ALLEN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 251, 252, 253 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |