20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVF03640 | KATHERINE JOHNSON | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs KATHERINE JOHNSON | |||||||||
21CVV00030 | BMV | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
TRENTON RYAN WARREN vs BMV | |||||||||
21CVF03639 | JAMES PINNEY | 11/8/2021 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS LLC vs JAMES PINNEY | |||||||||
21CVF03621 | BERNARD L TAYLOR | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BERNARD L TAYLOR | |||||||||
21CVG03625 | DEANNA ALLEN | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
KEYNOTE REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEME vs DEANNA ALLEN | |||||||||
21CVI03624 | JOSHUA FROWEIN | 11/5/2021 | |||||||
JAMES LIPPINCOTT vs JOSHUA FROWEIN | |||||||||
21CVE03615 | TRENTON WEHDE | 11/4/2021 | |||||||
DANIEL MURRAY vs TRENTON WEHDE | |||||||||
21CVG03616 | MBARUSHAMAHORO MUHOZA | 11/4/2021 | |||||||
DAVE ALSPACH vs MBARUSHAMAHORO MUHOZA | |||||||||
21CVG03607 | NICHLAS GARMAN | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
BIRGE & HELD ASSET MGMT NEW VILLAGER LLC vs NICHLAS GARMAN | |||||||||
21CVG03610 | KYLE SAVOIE | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
ATHLETES FIRST LLC vs KYLE SAVOIE | |||||||||
21CVG03609 | MARIE JACKSON | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT L FOR STONECREEK APARTMENTS LTD vs MARIE JACKSON | |||||||||
21CVG03608 | JAMES SEABOLT | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
BIRGE & HELD ASSET MGMT NEW VILLAGER LLC vs JAMES SEABOLT | |||||||||
21CVF03627 | BONNIE WRIGHTS | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs BONNIE WRIGHTS | |||||||||
21CVF03626 | ELLIOTT RONEY | 11/3/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs ELLIOTT RONEY | |||||||||
21CVG03606 | JZAN HOGAN | 11/2/2021 | |||||||
HUNTLEY RIDGE KETTERING, LLC vs JZAN HOGAN | |||||||||
21CVF03611 | JEFF FIRESTONE | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDLAN vs JEFF FIRESTONE | |||||||||
21CVF03612 | JEREMY MARTIN | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JEREMY MARTIN | |||||||||
21CVF03613 | LISA KELLCHER | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs LISA KELLCHER | |||||||||
21CVF03614 | MONICA M BEAL | 11/1/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs MONICA M BEAL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 254, 255, 256 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |