20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVF03417 | MARGARET LOZANO | 9/27/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs MARGARET LOZANO | |||||||||
21CVI03411 | DARREN PRICE | 9/27/2021 | |||||||
VERNON RUCKER vs DARREN PRICE | |||||||||
21CVF03415 | CARRIE MERELO | 9/27/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs CARRIE MERELO | |||||||||
21CVF03407 | TAYVIAN M ROGERS | 9/24/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL vs TAYVIAN M ROGERS | |||||||||
21CVG03403 | SHAMARI KENNEBREW | 9/24/2021 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs SHAMARI KENNEBREW | |||||||||
21CVG03404 | SALEH ALNUAYRI | 9/24/2021 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs SALEH ALNUAYRI | |||||||||
21CVG03405 | NANCY DAY | 9/24/2021 | |||||||
MANCO REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC vs NANCY DAY | |||||||||
21CVG03406 | JENN MCNALLY | 9/24/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs JENN MCNALLY | |||||||||
21CVI03392 | JOHN MCGIMSEY | 9/23/2021 | |||||||
BAUER ROOFING, SIDING, WINDOWS & vs JOHN MCGIMSEY | |||||||||
21CVI03400 | JOSEPH A HIX | 9/23/2021 | |||||||
BEVERLEE A COOPER vs JOSEPH A HIX | |||||||||
21CVG03402 | BRIDGETT YEATON-SMITH | 9/23/2021 | |||||||
KETTERING ESTATES, LLC vs BRIDGETT YEATON-SMITH | |||||||||
21CVG03401 | GARRET RUNYON | 9/23/2021 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs GARRET RUNYON | |||||||||
21CVI03391 | DOVETREE APARTMENTS | 9/22/2021 | |||||||
KIEL GREENLEE vs DOVETREE APARTMENTS | |||||||||
21CVG03386 | WILLIAM GRATHWOHL | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
AGORA REALTY GROUP vs WILLIAM GRATHWOHL | |||||||||
21CVG03387 | KEVIN KELLY | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
PINETREE APARTMENTS, LLC vs KEVIN KELLY | |||||||||
21CVG03388 | AMBER WHITE | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
KINSELER REALTY, LLC FOR MARY E. BANE & CHARLES BANE vs AMBER WHITE | |||||||||
21CVG03389 | PRISCA HERBERT | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
JEFF MALLOCK vs PRISCA HERBERT | |||||||||
21CVG03390 | DARRIEN POWELL | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs DARRIEN POWELL | |||||||||
21CVI03385 | ARTISTIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC | 9/21/2021 | |||||||
ABDELQADER ALSHRAFI vs ARTISTIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 261, 262, 263 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |