20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVF03395 | MICHAEL CLARE | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs MICHAEL CLARE | |||||||||
21CVF03396 | JAKE PHILLIPS | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs JAKE PHILLIPS | |||||||||
21CVF03397 | SAMATHA THOMPSON | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs SAMATHA THOMPSON | |||||||||
21CVF03398 | LAURA DUNKIN | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs LAURA DUNKIN | |||||||||
21CVF03399 | JONATHON WHITE | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs JONATHON WHITE | |||||||||
21CVG03408 | AMANDA RUCKER | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
MARK MURDOCH vs AMANDA RUCKER | |||||||||
21CVG03409 | BRIAN KINNISON | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE ESTATE vs BRIAN KINNISON | |||||||||
21CVV00025 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
PORTIA JOHNSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
21CVV00026 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
JACQULYNE M FRANKLIN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
21CVF03394 | RODNEY M ANDERSON | 9/20/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs RODNEY M ANDERSON | |||||||||
21CVI03366 | ROGER FERGUSON | 9/17/2021 | |||||||
ROBERT HOWARD vs ROGER FERGUSON | |||||||||
21CVV00024 | BMV REGISTRAR | 9/17/2021 | |||||||
SHANICE BAILEY vs BMV REGISTRAR | |||||||||
21CVG03359 | STACEY GRANVILLE | 9/16/2021 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING, LLC C/O PLK COMMUNITIES, LLC vs STACEY GRANVILLE | |||||||||
21CVV00023 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 9/15/2021 | |||||||
TARA LESLIE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
21CVF03344 | HEATHER N LILLY | 9/14/2021 | |||||||
CANDLESTONE RECOVERY LLC c/o Markoff Law LLC vs HEATHER N LILLY | |||||||||
21CVG03348 | JEFFREY KEMP | 9/14/2021 | |||||||
WERTZ REALTY INC vs JEFFREY KEMP | |||||||||
21CVG03349 | BRANDON BARNETT | 9/14/2021 | |||||||
THE CONNER GROUP vs BRANDON BARNETT | |||||||||
21CVG03352 | BRANDON ARBAUGH | 9/14/2021 | |||||||
MARCIA BACK vs BRANDON ARBAUGH | |||||||||
21CVF03360 | CYNTHIA M GARDINA | 9/13/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs CYNTHIA M GARDINA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 262, 263, 264 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |