20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG03151 | TERYN SMITH | 8/6/2021 | |||||||
KW COMMUNITY PARTNERS GOLDEN COAST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs TERYN SMITH | |||||||||
21CVF03152 | AMY L HACK | 8/5/2021 | |||||||
FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURES I, LLC vs AMY L HACK | |||||||||
21CVF03153 | ROESETTA TRUE | 8/5/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ROESETTA TRUE | |||||||||
21CVG03145 | PENNY M LOUIS | 8/5/2021 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOUSING OPPORTUNITIES, INC vs PENNY M LOUIS | |||||||||
21CVG03146 | JEFF STEVENS | 8/5/2021 | |||||||
H & W PREFERRED PROPERTIES, LLC vs JEFF STEVENS | |||||||||
21CVI03147 | VALVOLINE SERVICE CENTER | 8/5/2021 | |||||||
DANIEL GLASER vs VALVOLINE SERVICE CENTER | |||||||||
21CVG03137 | CHEYENNE PIERCE | 8/4/2021 | |||||||
BIRGE & HELD ASSET MGMT FOR NEW CHESAPEAKE, LLC vs CHEYENNE PIERCE | |||||||||
21CVG03138 | DANAH ALANAZI | 8/4/2021 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGENT OF GK OH APTS, LLC vs DANAH ALANAZI | |||||||||
21CVG03139 | JEREMY DEAN | 8/4/2021 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR GK OH APTS, LLC vs JEREMY DEAN | |||||||||
21CVF03136 | TAMMI L DEARTH | 8/3/2021 | |||||||
JOHN RUFFOLO, TRUSTEE vs TAMMI L DEARTH | |||||||||
21CVG03135 | LISA KERNS | 8/3/2021 | |||||||
TALIB PETAWAY vs LISA KERNS | |||||||||
21CVF03133 | LETTIA WATKINS | 8/3/2021 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs LETTIA WATKINS | |||||||||
21CVF03132 | BRANDON P COOPER | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
SENEX SERVICES CORPORATION SUCESOR IN INTEREST TO TRIHEALTH vs BRANDON P COOPER | |||||||||
21CVF03140 | BILL WHEELER | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BILL WHEELER | |||||||||
21CVF03141 | ANTHONY L LOMBARDO | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs ANTHONY L LOMBARDO | |||||||||
21CVF03142 | STEVEN JACKSON II | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs STEVEN JACKSON II | |||||||||
21CVF03143 | RICHARD HALL | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs RICHARD HALL | |||||||||
21CVF03144 | JAMES BOREK | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs JAMES BOREK | |||||||||
21CVF03148 | JUDITH A. FISHBACK | 8/2/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTERY VELDHUIS, vs JUDITH A. FISHBACK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 269, 270, 271 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |