20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVF02796 | MOLLY SOWRY | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs MOLLY SOWRY | |||||||||
21CVF02795 | LISA CHANDLER | 6/8/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs LISA CHANDLER | |||||||||
21CVF02809 | JAMES GARRIES | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JAMES GARRIES | |||||||||
21CVF02810 | SARAH RIEDER | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
RBC, INC vs SARAH RIEDER | |||||||||
21CVF02811 | TIM ULY | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs TIM ULY | |||||||||
21CVF02812 | MELISSA ADKINS | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MELISSA ADKINS | |||||||||
21CVF02813 | PAUL DOHSE JR. | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs PAUL DOHSE Jr. | |||||||||
21CVF02814 | CASSIE S WYATT | 6/7/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs CASSIE S WYATT | |||||||||
21CVG02760 | MICHAEL CAMPBELL | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC AGT FOR ROSELAWN CENTER, LP vs MICHAEL CAMPBELL | |||||||||
21CVG02761 | GABRIEL HABTESELASSIE | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC AGT FOR ROSELAWN CENTER, LP vs GABRIEL HABTESELASSIE | |||||||||
21CVG02755 | CRYSTAL INPERISON | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
MC4 LLC C/O T & P PROPERTIES SERVICES vs CRYSTAL INPERISON | |||||||||
21CVG02757 | DALLAS CROTHERS | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP, LLC vs DALLAS CROTHERS | |||||||||
21CVG02756 | THEODORE MAGIN | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
MC4 LLC C/O T & P PROPERTIES SERVICES vs THEODORE MAGIN | |||||||||
21CVF02762 | PAULA ALLEN | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PAULA ALLEN | |||||||||
21CVF02763 | DANIEL AMBURGEY | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DANIEL AMBURGEY | |||||||||
21CVF02764 | JAQUALLA DUNSON | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAQUALLA DUNSON | |||||||||
21CVF02765 | MICHELLE THOMASON | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHELLE THOMASON | |||||||||
21CVF02766 | RICHARD ROBERTS | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RICHARD ROBERTS | |||||||||
21CVF02767 | KAREN HASTON | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KAREN HASTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 285, 286, 287 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |