20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI02523 | VOSS CHEVROLET INC | 4/16/2021 | |||||||
ANN RICHARD vs VOSS CHEVROLET INC | |||||||||
21CVG02516 | GUY GEHY | 4/16/2021 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs GUY GEHY | |||||||||
21CVG02520 | JUDITH DUNN | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JUDITH DUNN | |||||||||
21CVI02515 | THE TINT SHOP | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
NICHOLE L MATHEWS vs THE TINT SHOP | |||||||||
21CVI02506 | CINDI MILLER | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
DANIEL PETERSON vs CINDI MILLER | |||||||||
21CVG02521 | U.S. AEROTEAM, INC | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
IRG MORAINE LLC vs U.S. AEROTEAM, INC | |||||||||
21CVG02507 | DAMEKA WHITE | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs DAMEKA WHITE | |||||||||
21CVF02522 | LINDA L ROBESON | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LINDA L ROBESON | |||||||||
21CVF02519 | ALICE GIBSON | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs ALICE GIBSON | |||||||||
21CVF02518 | MARCUS ROBINSON | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs MARCUS ROBINSON | |||||||||
21CVF02517 | SUSAN B HILLIARD | 4/13/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs SUSAN B HILLIARD | |||||||||
21CVF02508 | GRACE NEAL | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GRACE NEAL | |||||||||
21CVF02509 | ADRIAN JOHNSON | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ADRIAN JOHNSON | |||||||||
21CVF02510 | PETER UMINA | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs PETER UMINA | |||||||||
21CVF02511 | RICHARD R SWAIN JR. | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs RICHARD R SWAIN Jr. | |||||||||
21CVF02512 | TIM JONES | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs TIM JONES | |||||||||
21CVF02513 | DIANA DENTONWAUGH | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DIANA DENTONWAUGH | |||||||||
21CVF02514 | OTTO MYERS | 4/12/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs OTTO MYERS | |||||||||
21CVG02501 | SARAH GARCIA | 4/9/2021 | |||||||
OHIO COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE & PR vs SARAH GARCIA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 298, 299, 300 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |