20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI02573 | BEVERLY BURGESS | 4/23/2021 | |||||||
ADAM J POWERS vs BEVERLY BURGESS | |||||||||
21CVF02575 | PAUL WILFORD | 4/23/2021 | |||||||
FIFTH THIRD BANK, N.A. C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs PAUL WILFORD | |||||||||
21CVF02571 | PATRICK C GREANEY | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs PATRICK C GREANEY | |||||||||
21CVF02572 | DAWN SALYERS | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP vs DAWN SALYERS | |||||||||
21CVG02569 | CENTRUELLA T COLLIER | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LL vs CENTRUELLA T COLLIER | |||||||||
21CVG02570 | DAVID KLOSTERMAN | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
A RAY BROWN FAMILY INVESTMENT, L vs DAVID KLOSTERMAN | |||||||||
21CVF02566 | AMANDA N KARRIP | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs AMANDA N KARRIP | |||||||||
21CVF02567 | SEAN C RYON | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs SEAN C RYON | |||||||||
21CVF02568 | EMILY E BREWER | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOC vs EMILY E BREWER | |||||||||
21CVG02559 | GLENN DAVIS | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
WAYNE S DAVIS vs GLENN DAVIS | |||||||||
21CVF02565 | ANGELA K ZIEGLER | 4/20/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs ANGELA K ZIEGLER | |||||||||
21CVG02562 | AARON THORPE | 4/20/2021 | |||||||
BURLINGTON WOODS PROPERTIES vs AARON THORPE | |||||||||
21CVG02561 | AIRELLE MCQUEEN | 4/20/2021 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs AIRELLE MCQUEEN | |||||||||
21CVG02560 | NICHOLAS ANGLE | 4/20/2021 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs NICHOLAS ANGLE | |||||||||
21CVE02556 | ELAINE MALOTT | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
THOMAS J INTILI vs ELAINE MALOTT | |||||||||
21CVF02534 | ANGIE M MILLER | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ANGIE M MILLER | |||||||||
21CVF02535 | DANIEL E WEAVER | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs DANIEL E WEAVER | |||||||||
21CVF02537 | TRACIE D SMITH | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs TRACIE D SMITH | |||||||||
21CVF02538 | MELISSA HANKS | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs MELISSA HANKS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 299, 300, 301 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |