20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG03590 | DOREEN DAY | 12/9/2020 | |||||||
JONATHAN MURRAY vs DOREEN DAY | |||||||||
20CVF03598 | STEPHANIE BUTSCH | 12/9/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs STEPHANIE BUTSCH | |||||||||
20CVI03585 | NICHOLAS J DAVIS | 12/8/2020 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY COLON & RECTAL SURGEONS, INC vs NICHOLAS J DAVIS | |||||||||
20CVI03586 | RUSTY W SPARKS | 12/8/2020 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY COLON & RECTAL SURGEONS, INC vs RUSTY W SPARKS | |||||||||
20CVF03588 | ANGEL VALERIO | 12/7/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. INC vs ANGEL VALERIO | |||||||||
20CVF03589 | MICHAEL HARTLEY | 12/7/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MICHAEL HARTLEY | |||||||||
20CVG03587 | JOSEPH A MILLER | 12/7/2020 | |||||||
JONATHAN W DUKE vs JOSEPH A MILLER | |||||||||
20CVI03584 | GARY MITCHELL SUTTON | 12/7/2020 | |||||||
PETER S GARCIA vs GARY MITCHELL SUTTON | |||||||||
20CVG03579 | KIMBERLY COLLINGSWORTH | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
PINETREE APARTMENTS LLC vs KIMBERLY COLLINGSWORTH | |||||||||
20CVG03583 | JOHN BALLENGER | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs JOHN BALLENGER | |||||||||
20CVG03582 | KRISTINE BECKETT | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
TIKI ESTATES, LLC vs KRISTINE BECKETT | |||||||||
20CVG03581 | TONYA D GRIMES | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
ZENGEL SERVICES, LLC vs TONYA D GRIMES | |||||||||
20CVG03580 | MICHELLE COBB | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
MOJOKET, LLC vs MICHELLE COBB | |||||||||
20CVG03578 | TRAVIS SHOCKEY | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
PINETREE APARTMENTS, LLC vs TRAVIS SHOCKEY | |||||||||
20CVF03575 | GLENNA REESE | 12/4/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs GLENNA REESE | |||||||||
20CVF03571 | JOSHUA BURKHEISER | 12/3/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs JOSHUA BURKHEISER | |||||||||
20CVG03576 | JESSICA CUSHWA | 12/3/2020 | |||||||
CREEKWOOD LLC vs JESSICA CUSHWA | |||||||||
20CVF03557 | MELISSA FOUDRAY | 12/2/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs MELISSA FOUDRAY | |||||||||
20CVF03558 | LESLIE D CAMERON | 12/2/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LESLIE D CAMERON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 335, 336, 337 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |