20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF03429 | WARREN TUTWILER | 11/2/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs WARREN TUTWILER | |||||||||
20CVF03432 | CHELSEA JEFFRIES | 11/2/2020 | |||||||
CREATIVE IMAGES INSTITUTE OF COSMETOLOGY vs CHELSEA JEFFRIES | |||||||||
20CVF03433 | JENNIFER INMAN | 11/2/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER INMAN | |||||||||
20CVF03424 | MARIBETH SCHINDLER | 11/2/2020 | |||||||
SNCHRONY BANK vs MARIBETH SCHINDLER | |||||||||
20CVF03397 | DALE V PAXSON | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I , LLC vs DALE V PAXSON | |||||||||
20CVG03394 | CAMERON CONTANT | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs CAMERON CONTANT | |||||||||
20CVG03395 | LAURA WAKELEY | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs LAURA WAKELEY | |||||||||
20CVG03396 | NICHOLAS ANGLE | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs NICHOLAS ANGLE | |||||||||
20CVV00019 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
ANTHONY M CHRISMAN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
20CVF03386 | DERRON BRADLEY | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O SONNEK & GOLDBLATT LTD vs DERRON BRADLEY | |||||||||
20CVG03391 | BRUCE SMITH | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM for Ted Greenwood vs BRUCE SMITH | |||||||||
20CVG03390 | CALISHA WOOD | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOUSING OPPORTUNITIES, INC vs CALISHA WOOD | |||||||||
20CVG03389 | STEPHEN LILLY | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT LLC vs STEPHEN LILLY | |||||||||
20CVG03388 | ANDY SNODGRASS | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE SUB LLC vs ANDY SNODGRASS | |||||||||
20CVG03387 | ASHLEY WILLIAMS | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE SUB LLC vs ASHLEY WILLIAMS | |||||||||
20CVG03384 | KELLY BUTLER | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP, LLC vs KELLY BUTLER | |||||||||
20CVE03392 | GLENN WEATHERSPOON | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REBECCA TEMPLETON vs GLENN WEATHERSPO... | |||||||||
20CVF03379 | SHALON ARNETT | 10/27/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs SHALON ARNETT | |||||||||
20CVF03380 | KRISTIN THOMASON | 10/27/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs KRISTIN THOMASON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 344, 345, 346 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |