20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG03254 | ALEXANDAR HALL | 9/29/2020 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs ALEXANDAR HALL | |||||||||
20CVG03253 | NATHANIEL TURNED III | 9/29/2020 | |||||||
BRIAN BROADSTONE vs NATHANIEL TURNED III | |||||||||
20CVF03239 | MARK A FUND | 9/28/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs MARK A FUND | |||||||||
20CVF03240 | ESTEBAN LOPEZ | 9/28/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA NA vs ESTEBAN LOPEZ | |||||||||
20CVF03241 | JOHN BROWN | 9/28/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N. A. vs JOHN BROWN | |||||||||
20CVF03242 | DANIEL ROESCH | 9/28/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs DANIEL ROESCH | |||||||||
20CVF03238 | RICHARD A SWANTON | 9/25/2020 | |||||||
ALLY BANK vs RICHARD A SWANTON | |||||||||
20CVV00017 | BMV | 9/25/2020 | |||||||
CHARLES D JENKINS vs BMV | |||||||||
20CVF03229 | JARON GODDIN | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs JARON GODDIN | |||||||||
20CVI03217 | AARON KING | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
DARCION ANDERSON vs AARON KING | |||||||||
20CVG03233 | JAMARI AVERETTE | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs JAMARI AVERETTE | |||||||||
20CVG03232 | CHEN YU | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs CHEN YU | |||||||||
20CVG03231 | KAYLEE ERNEST | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs KAYLEE ERNEST | |||||||||
20CVG03230 | DARRYL WHITLEY | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs DARRYL WHITLEY | |||||||||
20CVG03216 | AL FERGUSON | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR GOVERNOURS SQUARE , LLC vs AL FERGUSON | |||||||||
20CVF03224 | JAMES C CHATTERTON | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
STONE CREEK FINANCIAL INC vs JAMES C CHATTERTON | |||||||||
20CVF03223 | MARC A RIDENOUR | 9/24/2020 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC vs MARC A RIDENOUR | |||||||||
20CVF03228 | JENNIFER BARLOW | 9/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs JENNIFER BARLOW | |||||||||
20CVF03234 | SCOTT FUNKHOUSER | 9/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs SCOTT FUNKHOUSER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 349, 350, 351 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |