20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02955 | DONALD HALL | 8/7/2020 | |||||||
RALPH L HOLLOWAY vs DONALD HALL | |||||||||
20CVE02948 | BARBARA A LAMBERT | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs BARBARA A LAMBERT | |||||||||
20CVF02949 | JOHN BROTHERS | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JOHN BROTHERS | |||||||||
20CVF02950 | LARRY LYMAN | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs LARRY LYMAN | |||||||||
20CVF02951 | BRITTANY SMITH | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
RELIABLE AUTO FINANCE, INC vs BRITTANY SMITH | |||||||||
20CVF02939 | KIMBERLY BAUER | 8/5/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs KIMBERLY BAUER | |||||||||
20CVF02947 | CARLOS CHAVANDO | 8/5/2020 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF LENDINGCLUB CORP vs CARLOS CHAVANDO | |||||||||
20CVG02937 | CHEYANNE GIBSON | 8/5/2020 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE PROPERT MANAGEMENT, AGENT FOR FLOWERDALE vs CHEYANNE GIBSON | |||||||||
20CVG02938 | EMILY FRYMAN | 8/5/2020 | |||||||
JOHN MASTBAUM vs EMILY FRYMAN | |||||||||
20CVF02941 | ANDRE JAMISON | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ANDRE JAMISON | |||||||||
20CVI02935 | TAMMY MURPHY | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
SHELBY THOMAS vs TAMMY MURPHY | |||||||||
20CVG02936 | TRISTA DOUGLAS | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs TRISTA DOUGLAS | |||||||||
20CVF02946 | DIANE BROWN | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs DIANE BROWN | |||||||||
20CVF02945 | JOANNE PROCTER | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs JOANNE PROCTER | |||||||||
20CVF02944 | LEANNA J BLAKE | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs LEANNA J BLAKE | |||||||||
20CVF02943 | JERRY M MOSHER | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JERRY M MOSHER | |||||||||
20CVF02942 | ELIZABETH ANN GABBARD | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ELIZABETH ANN GABBARD | |||||||||
20CVF02940 | CODEY J JORDAN | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs CODEY J JORDAN | |||||||||
20CVF02931 | KURT R LEITSCHUH II | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
ROGERS & GREENBERG, L.L.P. vs KURT R LEITSCHUH II | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 369, 370, 371 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |