20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02788 | STEPHEN THOMAS BISCARDI | 6/26/2020 | |||||||
SARAH SHAE BOURNE vs STEPHEN THOMAS BISCARDI | |||||||||
20CVF02779 | CINDY WEGHORST | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CINDY WEGHORST | |||||||||
20CVF02780 | TREVA WHALEN | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
FIRST PORTFOLIO VENTURES I, LLC vs TREVA WHALEN | |||||||||
20CVF02781 | LYNETTE CAMPBELL | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC vs LYNETTE CAMPBELL | |||||||||
20CVF02783 | RHONDA J PRICE | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs RHONDA J PRICE | |||||||||
20CVG02782 | KAREN MULHERN | 6/25/2020 | |||||||
MILLBURN APARTMENTS OF DAYTON II, LTD vs KAREN MULHERN | |||||||||
20CVF02777 | BUFFY CASSIDY | 6/24/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs BUFFY CASSIDY | |||||||||
20CVF02778 | JOSHUA CRAIG BENFIELD | 6/24/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JOSHUA CRAIG BENFIELD | |||||||||
20CVF02776 | MICHELLE MCMANN | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs MICHELLE MCMANN | |||||||||
20CVG02775 | MALIK CLEVELAND | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES vs MALIK CLEVELAND | |||||||||
20CVF02774 | MEGHAN MUNDEY | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs MEGHAN MUNDEY | |||||||||
20CVF02773 | AAREONNA GOINS | 6/23/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs AAREONNA GOINS | |||||||||
20CVF02771 | PHYLLIS COMBS | 6/22/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs PHYLLIS COMBS | |||||||||
20CVF02772 | AARON DICKEY | 6/22/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs AARON DICKEY | |||||||||
20CVF02760 | PATRICK C GREANEY | 6/19/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs PATRICK C GREANEY | |||||||||
20CVF02761 | AULIVE BARKER | 6/19/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs AULIVE BARKER | |||||||||
20CVF02762 | WILFRED BARTON | 6/19/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs WILFRED BARTON | |||||||||
20CVF02763 | CARLEEN THORNTON | 6/19/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs CARLEEN THORNTON | |||||||||
20CVF02764 | CARLA REED | 6/19/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs CARLA REED | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 377, 378, 379 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |