20713 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF02685 | TODD MARSHALL JR. | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TODD MARSHALL Jr. | |||||||||
20CVF02686 | JESSICA MONDAY | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JESSICA MONDAY | |||||||||
20CVF02687 | JESSICA MONDAY | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JESSICA MONDAY | |||||||||
20CVF02688 | JEFFREY T HARRIS | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JEFFREY T HARRIS | |||||||||
20CVG02678 | ALLEN LAKES | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs ALLEN LAKES | |||||||||
20CVV00007 | BMV | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
MARIANO PEREYRA vs BMV | |||||||||
20CVF02684 | ANDREW C NELSON | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs ANDREW C NELSON | |||||||||
20CVG02681 | LAN NGUYEN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT LLC vs LAN NGUYEN | |||||||||
20CVV00006 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES REGISTRAR | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
JAXON G TRAMMELL vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES REGISTRAR | |||||||||
20CVI02676 | MORAINE AUTO PARTS | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
DORIAN PIERCE vs MORAINE AUTO PARTS | |||||||||
20CVH02675 | CITY OF CENTERVILLE | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
DIANE M TARKANY vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE | |||||||||
20CVG02680 | CHARLES FAULKNER | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT LLC vs CHARLES FAULKNER | |||||||||
20CVG02679 | TONI GREGORY | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
SCHWIETERMAN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs TONI GREGORY | |||||||||
20CVG02677 | EMILY FRYMAN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
JOHN MASTBAUM vs EMILY FRYMAN | |||||||||
20CVG02672 | ASHLEY PURNELL | 6/1/2020 | |||||||
BATROUN GROUP LLC vs ASHLEY PURNELL | |||||||||
20CVG02673 | HEIDI HEMINGER | 6/1/2020 | |||||||
VAUGHN GROUP LTD vs HEIDI HEMINGER | |||||||||
20CVG02674 | ELIZABETH TAYLOR | 6/1/2020 | |||||||
INDEPENDENCE PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs ELIZABETH TAYLOR | |||||||||
20CVG02671 | TERRY DEAN | 5/29/2020 | |||||||
CT OHIO DAYTON-CENTERVILLE, LLC vs TERRY DEAN | |||||||||
20CVI02670 | CHRISTIN MCGUFFIE | 5/28/2020 | |||||||
MORRIS DEMITRY vs CHRISTIN MCGUFFIE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 379, 380, 381 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 Next |