20771 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02727 | L&L RANCH LLC | 6/11/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS W. KENDO, JR. CO. L.P.A vs L&L RANCH LLC | |||||||||
20CVF02721 | JOEL ROGERS | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JOEL ROGERS | |||||||||
20CVF02722 | EDWARD BRABSTON | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs EDWARD BRABSTON | |||||||||
20CVF02723 | KELLEY CHING | 6/10/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSN. LLC vs KELLEY CHING | |||||||||
20CVI02710 | USAA INSURANCE COMPANY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
MICHAEL MCADAMS vs USAA INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVF02715 | APRIL WILLIAMS | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs APRIL WILLIAMS | |||||||||
20CVF02720 | JERRY WEGHORST | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JERRY WEGHORST | |||||||||
20CVF02719 | CHRISTOPHER ENGLISH | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs CHRISTOPHER ENGLISH | |||||||||
20CVF02718 | FOUAD ROMA | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASIGNEE OF FIRST NAT'L BANK vs FOUAD ROMA | |||||||||
20CVF02717 | JENNIFER ROCKHOLD | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC vs JENNIFER ROCKHOLD | |||||||||
20CVF02716 | KATHERINE A ELLIOTT | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs KATHERINE A ELLIOTT | |||||||||
20CVF02714 | ALYSSA VOSKUHL | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs ALYSSA VOSKUHL | |||||||||
20CVF02713 | HELEN SALAS | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs HELEN SALAS | |||||||||
20CVF02712 | WILLIAM LEWIS | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs WILLIAM LEWIS | |||||||||
20CVF02711 | CYNTHIA HACKMAN | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs CYNTHIA HACKMAN | |||||||||
20CVF02709 | LINDA ARLENE AUDIA | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs LINDA ARLENE AUDIA | |||||||||
20CVF02703 | JEREMY M WARD | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JEREMY M WARD | |||||||||
20CVF02707 | YVONNE EIDEMILER | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs YVONNE EIDEMILER | |||||||||
20CVF02708 | TRALENA SHAYRON RAZOR | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
JK REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC vs TRALENA SHAYRON RAZOR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 380, 381, 382 ... 1037, 1038, 1039 Next |