20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG02674 | ELIZABETH TAYLOR | 6/1/2020 | |||||||
INDEPENDENCE PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs ELIZABETH TAYLOR | |||||||||
20CVG02671 | TERRY DEAN | 5/29/2020 | |||||||
CT OHIO DAYTON-CENTERVILLE, LLC vs TERRY DEAN | |||||||||
20CVI02670 | CHRISTIN MCGUFFIE | 5/28/2020 | |||||||
MORRIS DEMITRY vs CHRISTIN MCGUFFIE | |||||||||
20CVF02579 | SHARON SHERER | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs SHARON SHERER | |||||||||
20CVF02669 | MEGAN CUNNINGHAM | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO CLARK STATE COMMUNITY COLLEGE vs MEGAN CUNNINGHAM | |||||||||
20CVI02666 | HAROLD DEAN LILLY JR. | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
MATT SUWALSKI vs HAROLD DEAN LILLY Jr. | |||||||||
20CVF02667 | ANITA A ALLEN | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs ANITA A ALLEN | |||||||||
20CVF02668 | JULIE R ROUSE | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JULIE R ROUSE | |||||||||
20CVG02665 | JONNA CROSS | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE APARTMENTS vs JONNA CROSS | |||||||||
20CVF02662 | RICHARD B ROBERTS | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs RICHARD B ROBERTS | |||||||||
20CVV00005 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
CAPRIEL JONES vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
20CVI02656 | DIANE RITTER | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
OHIO IRRIGATION CO. vs DIANE RITTER | |||||||||
20CVI02655 | JOANNE DEUTSCH | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
OHIO IRRIGATION CO. vs JOANNE DEUTSCH | |||||||||
20CVG02663 | DAWN M WILLIFORD | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM for Ted Greenwood vs DAWN M WILLIFORD | |||||||||
20CVF02664 | MIKEAL WARREN | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
MOREHEAD STATE UNIVERSITY vs MIKEAL WARREN | |||||||||
20CVF02661 | VICKI HENRY | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs VICKI HENRY | |||||||||
20CVF02657 | PAUL D REED | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs PAUL D REED | |||||||||
20CVF02658 | JUSTIN RISSMILLER | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC ASSIGNEE OF UPSTART NETWORK, INC vs JUSTIN RISSMILLER | |||||||||
20CVF02659 | RICHARD FROCK | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs RICHARD FROCK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 385, 386, 387 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |