20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF02607 | TAYLOR MORRIS | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs TAYLOR MORRIS | |||||||||
20CVF02588 | HOLLY KUSROW | 5/4/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs HOLLY KUSROW | |||||||||
20CVF02589 | LYNDSEY DIGGS | 5/4/2020 | |||||||
MSW CAPITAL LLC vs LYNDSEY DIGGS | |||||||||
20CVF02590 | CONWAY BENNINGFIELD | 5/4/2020 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs CONWAY BENNINGFIELD | |||||||||
20CVF02591 | BILLY BARNES III | 5/4/2020 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs BILLY BARNES III | |||||||||
20CVF02584 | HANNAH HOFFMAN | 5/1/2020 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O SONNEK & GOLDBLATT LTD vs HANNAH HOFFMAN | |||||||||
20CVF02585 | MYKEYLA SMITH | 5/1/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs MYKEYLA SMITH | |||||||||
20CVF02586 | JOSEPH GOLDSMITH | 5/1/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs JOSEPH GOLDSMITH | |||||||||
20CVF02583 | DENVER HAAS | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs DENVER HAAS | |||||||||
20CVF02582 | VICTORIA HARRISON | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs VICTORIA HARRISON | |||||||||
20CVF02581 | CONNIE ALTHAUS | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs CONNIE ALTHAUS | |||||||||
20CVF02578 | KIERSTEN WILBURN | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA/ DEPT ST vs KIERSTEN WILBUR... | |||||||||
20CVF02580 | SHARON SHERER | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs SHARON SHERER | |||||||||
20CVF02562 | BRIAN JACOBS | 4/22/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRIAN JACOBS | |||||||||
20CVF02563 | GEORGE GEE | 4/22/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GEORGE GEE | |||||||||
20CVF02564 | KATHY SEALS | 4/22/2020 | |||||||
CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST vs KATHY SEALS | |||||||||
20CVF02565 | CHRISTOPHER LUNEKE | 4/22/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHRISTOPHER LUNEKE | |||||||||
20CVF02573 | JEROME D DARNELL | 4/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDUSA CREDIT UNION INC vs JEROME D DARNELL | |||||||||
20CVF02574 | WANDA JACKSON | 4/21/2020 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs WANDA JACKSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 389, 390, 391 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |