20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVV00048 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/13/2019 | |||||||
JEREMY JACKSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
19CVF04290 | JOHN D HAIGHT | 12/12/2019 | |||||||
RAHN DENTAL OF OHIO LLC vs JOHN D HAIGHT | |||||||||
19CVG04292 | JESSICA LYNN RATLIFF | 12/12/2019 | |||||||
ALPINE PARTNERS, LLC vs JESSICA LYNN RATLIFF | |||||||||
19CVI04289 | ERICA HAZELRIGG-PRICE | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
EDISON J APPLEGATE Jr. vs ERICA HAZELRIGG-PRICE | |||||||||
19CVG04301 | THERESA TACKETT | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs THERESA TACKETT | |||||||||
19CVG04299 | HUSSEIN KODELA | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs HUSSEIN KODELA | |||||||||
19CVF04310 | REBECCA CESPEDES | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs REBECCA CESPEDES | |||||||||
19CVF04309 | KELLIE L GRAPES | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KELLIE L GRAPES | |||||||||
19CVF04308 | ERICA KAIN | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ERICA KAIN | |||||||||
19CVF04307 | LORI S WILLIS | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs LORI S WILLIS | |||||||||
19CVF04306 | JAMES MUELLER | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JAMES MUELLER | |||||||||
19CVF04287 | BETHANY ROWLAND | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
PATHWAYS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION vs BETHANY ROWLAND | |||||||||
19CVG04281 | CHARLES YOUNG JR. | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
CHARLES YOUNG Sr. vs CHARLES YOUNG Jr. | |||||||||
19CVG04283 | BRENDEN WOOD | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
BRIAN WOOD vs BRENDEN WOOD | |||||||||
19CVE04303 | ANDREA K BROWN | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO. vs ANDREA K BROWN | |||||||||
19CVF04288 | DANIELLE MACKEY | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDLAN vs DANIELLE MACKEY | |||||||||
19CVF04291 | ABDULLAH ALRAKBAN | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs ABDULLAH ALRAKBAN | |||||||||
19CVF04293 | TERESA JOHNSON | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs TERESA JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVF04294 | ROSEMARY PETERS | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROSEMARY PETERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 405, 406, 407 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |