20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03046 | TYLER JUMP | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs TYLER JUMP | |||||||||
19CVF03047 | TAMEKA HOSKINS | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TAMEKA HOSKINS | |||||||||
19CVF03051 | JOYCE KEITH | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JOYCE KEITH | |||||||||
19CVF03052 | JOHN MCGUIRE | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JOHN MCGUIRE | |||||||||
19CVG03033 | MICHAEL BAKER | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MIMG LXXXIX VAN BUREN VILLAGE LL vs MICHAEL BAKER | |||||||||
19CVG03034 | MICHELLE CAMPBELL | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
MOJODAY, LLC vs MICHELLE CAMPBELL | |||||||||
19CVF03045 | NYKOLE EWING | 6/12/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs NYKOLE EWING | |||||||||
19CVF03050 | QUYEN LUU | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs QUYEN LUU | |||||||||
19CVG03032 | JULIA YOUNGERMAN | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
NADER GIRGIS vs JULIA YOUNGERMAN | |||||||||
19CVG03021 | ANTHONY BEST | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs ANTHONY BEST | |||||||||
19CVF03049 | STEWART PETERS | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs STEWART PETERS | |||||||||
19CVF03023 | AMANDA MELANSON | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs AMANDA MELANSON | |||||||||
19CVF03022 | MARIA FIGUEROA | 6/11/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs MARIA FIGUEROA | |||||||||
19CVE03020 | PRESHIA N GRIFFIN | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs PRESHIA N GRIFFIN | |||||||||
19CVG03018 | KENYATTA RHAMES | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs KENYATTA RHAMES | |||||||||
19CVG03019 | CHASITY REED | 6/10/2019 | |||||||
PREMIER REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, LLC vs CHASITY REED | |||||||||
19CVV00033 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 6/7/2019 | |||||||
STEPHAN D MCKOWEN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
19CVF03017 | RIAD SHUMAN | 6/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs RIAD SHUMAN | |||||||||
19CVG03016 | ALLEN VAUGHN | 6/6/2019 | |||||||
STEPHANIE JACKSON vs ALLEN VAUGHN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 475, 476, 477 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |