Daily Law Journal
4835 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
8/18/2015 ELLEN HUSKEY 8/10/2015
CHRIS MILLS vs ELLEN HUSKEY
15CVG00943 RANDA OSBORNE, ET AL. AND LARRY OSBORNE, ET AL. 8/6/2015
PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED vs RANDA OSBORNE, ET AL. and LARRY OSBORNE, E...
15CVF00391 BRITTANY M. IDDINGS 8/5/2015
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS X, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE CARD SER vs BRITTANY M. IDDINGS
15CVG00988 WILMAR RAMOS, ET AL. 8/4/2015
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs WILMAR RAMOS, ET AL.
15CVG00987 JOHN STARK, ET AL 8/4/2015
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs JOHN STARK, ET AL
15CVG00986 MARCUS CAUDILL, ET AL 8/4/2015
GAWAIN CIRCLE, LP DBA CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS. vs MARCUS CAUDILL, ET AL
15CVG00985 JEREMY GILBERT, ET AL AND JOSEPH BERRYMAN, ET AL A... 8/4/2015
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs JEREMY GILBERT, ET AL A...
15CVG00984 MUNIRA OWAIMER, ET AL AND FAHAD OWAYMIR, ET AL 8/4/2015
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs MUNIRA OWAIMER, ET AL AND F...
15CVG00983 SETH HANSEN. ET AL. AND ASHLEY DAMRON, ET AL. 8/4/2015
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs SETH HANSEN. ET AL. AND...
15CVG00982 ZHEN WENG, ET AL 8/4/2015
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs ZHEN WENG, ET AL
15CVG00981 MARK HOLBERT, ET AL 8/4/2015
ADARA COMMUNITIES DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs MARK HOLBERT, ET AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 6, 7, 8 ... 240, 241, 242  Next