12036 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF01351 | FELICIA HEARD | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs FELICIA HEARD | |||||||||
18CVF02094 | KANDY L COX CC HAIR STUDIOS AND JOANNA L CUSICK DB... | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
WOODLANE PLAZA ASSOCIATES LLC vs KANDY L COX CC HAIR STUDIOS AND JOANNA L CUSICK DB..... | |||||||||
18CVF01508 | MARISSA APPLE | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MARISSA APPLE | |||||||||
19CVG00038 | JOHN LAFFERTY, AND ALL OTHERS AND CHRISTIANA DEAN | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs JOHN LAFFERTY, AND ALL OTHERS AND CHRISTIANA DEAN | |||||||||
19CVG00150 | KIMBERLEE THARP AND SAMANTHA WAGNER AND ALL OTHERS | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs KIMBERLEE THARP AND SAMANTHA WAGNER AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
05CVH00881 | JEFFREY P FISHER | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
PALISADES COLLECTION LLC vs JEFFREY P FISHER | |||||||||
19CVF00025 | EMILY CAMPBELL | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs EMILY CAMPBELL | |||||||||
12CVH00028 | NICOLE STEINER | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs NICOLE STEINER | |||||||||
18CVE00231 | SYCAMORE WALK CONDO OWNERS' ASSOC., INC., AND TOWN... | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
MOTORS INSURANCE CORP AND JEFF SCHMITT CHEVROLET, LTD vs SYCAMORE WALK CONDO OWNERS' ... | |||||||||
18CVF01541 | COLLETTE CRAWFORD | 3/26/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs COLLETTE CRAWFORD | |||||||||
19CVG00341 | CURTIS SMITH AND ALL OTHERS | 3/25/2019 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs CURTIS SMITH AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG00342 | K. SCOTT WHITE AND JESSICA WHITE AND ALL OTHERS | 3/25/2019 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING, LLC DBA OAKWOOD VILLAGE vs K. SCOTT WHITE AND JESSICA WHITE AN... | |||||||||
19CVG00318 | JESSICA APPLEGATE AND ALL OTHERS | 3/21/2019 | |||||||
CARLYN MOYER vs JESSICA APPLEGATE AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG00271 | RACHEL Y HOSKINS AND ANTHONY J BEST | 3/21/2019 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT, LLC DBA OAKWOOD APARTMENTS vs RACHEL Y HOSKINS AND ANTHONY J ... | |||||||||
18CVE01463 | CHRISTINE JOHNSON | 3/20/2019 | |||||||
GEORGE WALTERS vs CHRISTINE JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVG00345 | ALLAN ORELLANA AND LILIANA GARCIA AND ALL OTHERS | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs ALLAN ORELLANA and LILIANA GARCIA AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG00346 | MARGARET HOUSE AND ALL OTHERS | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs MARGARET HOUSE AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
19CVG00356 | FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DBA QDOBA MEXICAN GRILL | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
BRIXMOR HOLDINGS 10 SPE, LLC C/O BRIXMOR PROPERTY GROUP vs FIESTA VENTURES 1, INC. DB... | |||||||||
19CVG00368 | WILLIAM WALLACE AND JATANA WALLACE, AND ALL OTHERS | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
DEAN WRUCK vs WILLIAM WALLACE and JATANA WALLACE, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 218, 219, 220 ... 600, 601, 602 Next |